EP2326097 - System and method for synchronizing 3D shutter glasses to television refresh rate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2011/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hulvey, Robert William 602 N. Irena Avenue Redondo Beach, CA 90277 / US | 02 /
Ding, Shawn Shiliang 8330 Autumn Ridge Way San Diego, CA 92129 / US | [2011/21] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10014571.3 | 12.11.2010 | [2011/21] | Priority number, date | US20090281893P | 20.11.2009 Original published format: US 281893 P | US20100313489P | 12.03.2010 Original published format: US 313489 P | US20100943741 | 10.11.2010 Original published format: US 943741 | [2011/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2326097 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2326097 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/04 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
H04N13/341 (EP,US);
H04N13/398 (EP,US);
H04N2013/40 (EP,US);
H04N2213/008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/21] | H04N13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Synchronisierung von 3D-Shutterbrillen mit einer TV-Bildwiederholrate | [2011/21] | English: | System and method for synchronizing 3D shutter glasses to television refresh rate | [2011/21] | French: | Système et procédé de synchronisation de verres d'obturateurs en 3D pour taux d'actualisation de télévision | [2011/21] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/48] | 27.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2010091113 (BIT CAULDRON CORP [US]; MENTZ JAMES [US]; CALDWELL SAMUEL [US]) [XP] 1-15 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0116] *; | [IA]US4967268 (LIPTON LENNY [US] ET AL) [I] 1,3-6,9-11,13-15 * column 3, line 49 - column 12, line 27 * [A] 2,12; | [IA]US6188442 (NARAYANASWAMI CHANDRASEKHAR [US]) [I] 1,3-5,8-11,13-15 * column 3, line 26 - column 8, line 15 * [A] 2,12; | [Y]US2007247477 (LOWRY GREGORY N [CA] ET AL) [Y] 1-3,6-8,10-13 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0072] *; | [Y]EP1995910 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [Y] 1-3,6-8,10-13 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0057] *; | [A]US2001043266 (ROBINSON KERRY [US] ET AL) [A] 1,3-5,7,10,11,13-15 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0082]; figure 8B *; | [A]US2007085902 (WALKER BRADLEY W [US] ET AL) [A] 1,3-5,11,13-15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0036] * | by applicant | US19930612818 | US19890613134 |