EP2453252 - Energy efficient 3D sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cedes AG Kantonsstrasse 14 7302 Landquart / CH | [2012/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beat De Coi Proderstrasse 69a 7320 Sargans / CH | 02 /
Leutenegger, Tobias Kronengasse 9 7000 Chur / CH | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Großtobeler Straße 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Ravensburg / Berg / DE | ||
Former [2012/20] | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Ravensburg / Berg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10014619.0 | 15.11.2010 | [2012/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2453252 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2453252 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/481, G01S7/497, G01S17/02, G01S17/87, G01S17/89 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
G01S7/4813 (EP,US);
G01S17/04 (EP,US);
G01S17/87 (EP,US);
G01S17/894 (EP,US);
G01S7/4814 (EP,US);
G01S7/497 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] |
Former [2012/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Energiespar-3D-sensor | [2012/20] | English: | Energy efficient 3D sensor | [2012/20] | French: | Capteur 3D à économie d'énergie | [2012/20] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2010 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 30.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13004164.3 / EP2667218 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2010 | AL | 10.06.2015 | CY | 10.06.2015 | CZ | 10.06.2015 | DK | 10.06.2015 | EE | 10.06.2015 | ES | 10.06.2015 | FI | 10.06.2015 | HR | 10.06.2015 | IT | 10.06.2015 | LT | 10.06.2015 | LV | 10.06.2015 | MC | 10.06.2015 | MK | 10.06.2015 | MT | 10.06.2015 | NL | 10.06.2015 | PL | 10.06.2015 | RO | 10.06.2015 | RS | 10.06.2015 | SI | 10.06.2015 | SK | 10.06.2015 | SM | 10.06.2015 | TR | 10.06.2015 | BG | 10.09.2015 | NO | 10.09.2015 | GR | 11.09.2015 | IS | 10.10.2015 | PT | 12.10.2015 | AT | 15.11.2015 | GB | 15.11.2015 | IE | 15.11.2015 | LU | 15.11.2015 | FR | 30.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 15.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MK | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
SM | 10.06.2015 | ||
TR | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
AT | 15.11.2015 | ||
GB | 15.11.2015 | ||
IE | 15.11.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
FR | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | HU | 15.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
SM | 10.06.2015 | ||
TR | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
AT | 15.11.2015 | ||
GB | 15.11.2015 | ||
IE | 15.11.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
FR | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 15.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
SM | 10.06.2015 | ||
TR | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
AT | 15.11.2015 | ||
GB | 15.11.2015 | ||
IE | 15.11.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
FR | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/19] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
AT | 15.11.2015 | ||
GB | 15.11.2015 | ||
IE | 15.11.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
FR | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
GB | 15.11.2015 | ||
IE | 15.11.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
FR | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/47] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
GB | 15.11.2015 | ||
IE | 15.11.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
IE | 15.11.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 10.06.2015 | |
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002172514 (GABELLO LOUIS R [US], et al) [Y] 10,11 * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0050] * * figure - *; | [Y]US2004135990 (OHTOMO FUMIO [JP], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1,2 *; | [XAY]EP1933167 (SICK AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0033] * * figure - * [A] 5,8 [Y] 7,10,11; | [XA]US2008285842 (PLASBERG GEORG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0085]; figure - * [A] 5; | [A]US2010020209 (KIM SEONG JIN [KR]) [A] 10,11 * paragraph [0068] ** paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0109]; figure - * | Examination | EP1031471 |