EP2333922 - Junction box for solar modules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lumberg Connect GmbH Im Gewerbepark 2 58579 Schalksmühle / DE | [2011/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richter, Michael Harrenscheid 7c 58579 Schalksmühle / DE | [2011/24] | Representative(s) | Ostriga Sonnet Wirths & Vorwerk Patentanwälte Friedrich-Engels-Allee 432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Ostriga Sonnet Wirths & Vorwerk Patentanwälte Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2012/28] | Roche, von Westernhagen & Ehresmann Patentanwaltskanzlei Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2012/19] | Ostriga Sonnet Wirths & Vorwerk Patentanwälte Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2011/24] | Ostriga, Sonnet, Wirths & Roche Patentanwälte Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 D-42283 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 10014807.1 | 20.11.2010 | [2011/24] | Priority number, date | DE20091058118 | 12.12.2009 Original published format: DE102009058118 | [2011/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2333922 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2333922 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/08, H02G15/007 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
H02G15/007 (EP,US);
H02G3/083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anschlussdose für Solarmodule | [2011/24] | English: | Junction box for solar modules | [2011/24] | French: | Boîte de jonction pour modules solaires | [2011/24] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 06.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/47] | 27.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.09.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE8901715U ; | [A]DE19739151 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [X]WO0030216 (UTILUX PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [Y]CN201303235Y (QC SOLAR SUZHOU CO LTD [CN]) | by applicant | DE202008006119U |