EP2295191 - Method for producing a hole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/11] | Method and device for producing a hole | ||
[2016/01] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beck, Thomas Jägerstr. 25 D 16341 Panketal / DE | 02 /
Settegast, Silke Paul-Robeson-Str. 35 10439 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Wolkers, Lutz Dr. Heinrich-Könn-Str. 59 40625 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | 01 /
Beck, Thomas Jägerstr. 20 D 16341 Panketal / DE | ||
02 /
Settegast, Silke Paul-Robeson-Str. 35 10439 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
Wolkers, Lutz Dr. Heinrich-Könn-Str. 59 40625 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 10014877.4 | 21.12.2005 | [2011/11] | Priority number, date | EP20050000729 | 14.01.2005 Original published format: EP 05000729 | [2011/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2295191 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/38, F01D5/18 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
B23K26/0604 (EP,US);
B23K26/384 (EP,US);
B23K26/389 (EP,US);
B23K2101/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Lochs | [2016/01] | English: | Method for producing a hole | [2016/01] | French: | Méthode pour fabriquer un trou | [2016/01] |
Former [2011/11] | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Lochs und Vorrichtung | ||
Former [2011/11] | Method and device for producing a hole | ||
Former [2011/11] | Méthode et dispositif pour fabriquer un trou | Examination procedure | 01.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 08.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/42] | 06.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/42] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05847514.6 / EP1838489 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050847514) is 26.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6172331 (CHEN XIANGLI [US]); | [Y]DE10063309 (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE]); | [A]GB2389330 (M J TECHNOLOGIES LTD [GB]) | by applicant | US5073687 | EP0486489 | EP0412397 | EP0892090 | EP0786017 | US5939010 | WO9967435 | US6024792 | US6054673 | WO0044949 | US6172331 | DE10063309 | US6479788 | EP1306454 | EP1319729 | EP1204776 | EP1510593 |