EP2351646 - Multilayer sheet- or tube-shaped food casing or food film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUHNE ANLAGENBAU GmbH Einsteinstrasse 20 53757 St. Augustin/Menden / DE | [2011/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schiffmann, Jürgen Ölgartenstradde 23 53773 Hennef / DE | [2011/31] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2012/45] | Kopp, Stephan, et al Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2011/50] | Kopp, Stephan, et al Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2011/31] | Kopp, Stephan Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 10014919.4 | 07.08.2007 | [2011/31] | Priority number, date | DE20061036844 | 07.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006036844 | [2011/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2351646 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2351646 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, B32B27/32, B32B27/34, B32B27/36, B29C47/00 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/00 (KR);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/10 (EP,US);
B29C48/185 (EP,US);
B29C48/21 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/34 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B29C48/0018 (EP,US);
B29C48/022 (EP,US);
B29C48/22 (EP,US);
B29K2023/06 (EP,US);
B29K2023/083 (EP,US);
B29K2023/086 (EP,US);
B29K2033/12 (EP,US);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29K2069/00 (EP,US);
B29K2077/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/256 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7128 (EP,US);
B32B2250/05 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1324 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1328 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1334 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1341 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2826 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31725 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31728 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/31] | Extension states | RS | 03.02.2012 | Title | German: | Mehrschichtige flächen- oder schlauchförmige Nahrungsmittelhülle oder -folie | [2011/31] | English: | Multilayer sheet- or tube-shaped food casing or food film | [2011/31] | French: | Feuille multicouche, planiforme ou tubulaire, pour denrées alimentaires | [2011/31] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 18.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07801535.1 / EP2051854 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070801535) is 21.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.11.2012 | EE | 07.11.2012 | LT | 07.11.2012 | LV | 07.11.2012 | MC | 07.11.2012 | MT | 07.11.2012 | IS | 07.03.2013 | LU | 07.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
MC | 07.11.2012 | ||
MT | 07.11.2012 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
MC | 07.11.2012 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | EE | 07.11.2012 | |
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | LT | 07.11.2012 | |
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | LT | 07.11.2012 | |
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 07.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0103922 (TECNO COATING ENG SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1 * page 6, lines 24-30 - page 3, lines 11-16; claims 1,6 * * page 2, lines 6,17 *; | [AD]DE10227580 (KUHNE ANLAGENBAU GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,2* page 3, line 12, paragraphs 10,20 *; | [AP]EP1749655 (CURWOOD INC [US]) [AP] 1,2 * paragraphs [0027] , [0033]; figures 3,4; claims 1,13,22-24,29,31,33 *; | [A] - JAMES D. STOBIE, "Producing Coextruded High Barrier Heat-Shrinkable Packaging Films", PAPER, FILM & FOIL CONVERTER, ISSN 0031-1138, (20031001), URL: http://pffc-online.com/the_place/paper_producing_coextruded_high, (20071010), XP002456925 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0236099 | EP0476836 | DE10227580 | EP1034076 | DE10254172 | WO2005011978 | WO2004EP51560 |