EP2327899 - Torque-limiting coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schwelling, Hermann Hartmannweg 5 88682 Salem / DE | [2011/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/22] | Representative(s) | Fürst, Siegfried Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Kanzlei "Region Göppingen" Postfach 10 22 73010 Göppingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/22] | Fürst, Siegfried Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hansmann & Vogeser, Kanzlei "Region Göppingen" Stuttgarter Strasse 163 73066 Uhingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10014931.9 | 24.11.2010 | [2011/22] | Priority number, date | DE20091055795 | 25.11.2009 Original published format: DE102009055795 | [2011/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2327899 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2327899 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16D7/04 | [2011/22] | CPC: |
F16D7/048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Drehmoment begrenzende Kupplung | [2011/22] | English: | Torque-limiting coupling | [2011/22] | French: | Embrayage limitant le couple | [2011/22] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/35] | 18.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]BE551787 (F.H. ERRENS) [X] 1-8 * the whole document * [I] 8; | [A]DE102005059658 (ZF LENKSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US4273230 (GUNDAL PETER H, et al) [A] 1-8 * column 3 - column 6; figures 4,6 *; | [A]DE3335535 (M A T MALMEDIE ANTRIEBSTECHNIK) [A] 1-8 * column 3 - column 5; figure 2 *; | [A]DE10122272 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-8 * column 3 - column 5; figures 3,4 * | by applicant | DE10353188 |