Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.03.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] |
19.10.2011 | New entry: Observations by third parties | |
19.08.2011 | Publication of search report | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] |
19.08.2011 | Change - classification | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] |
19.08.2011 | Change - classification | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] |
29.04.2011 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] |