EP2328230 - Device for transporting and mounting a mast [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ott, Volker Vogteistrasse 11 88441 Mittelbiberach / DE | [2011/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/22] | Representative(s) | Sawodny, Michael-Wolfgang Dreiköniggasse 10 89073 Ulm / DE | [2011/22] | Application number, filing date | 10014942.6 | 24.11.2010 | [2011/22] | Priority number, date | EP20090014799 | 27.11.2009 Original published format: EP 09014799 | [2011/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2328230 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2328230 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/32, H01Q1/12, E04H12/00 | [2011/38] | CPC: |
H01Q1/1235 (EP);
H01Q1/1242 (EP);
H01Q1/3275 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/22] | H01Q1/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Transport und zur Halterung eines Mastes | [2011/22] | English: | Device for transporting and mounting a mast | [2011/22] | French: | Dispositif de transport et de fixation d'un mât | [2011/22] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2011 | Observations by third parties | 12.03.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0196247 (LAMBOLEZ CLAUDE); | [A]US4913458 (HAMILTON MARK L [US]); | [X]US6227791 (JARVINEN JARI [US], et al); | [X]WO2007014427 (NIELSEN ERIC [AU]) | by applicant | DE3105621 | US4913458 | EP0518139 | US5537125 | US6253502 | WO2007014427 |