EP2332534 - Phenol and benzoquinone derivatives for use in the treatment of mitochondrial diseases and modulation of energy biomarkers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOELECTRON TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 350 North Bernardo Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2017/27] |
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states Edison Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 350 North Bernardo Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Guy, M. 350 North Bernardo Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
Hecht, Sidney, M. Department of Chemistry University of Virginia McCormick Road P.O.Box 400319 Charlottesville, VA 22904-4319 / US | 03 /
Jankowski, Orion, D. 350 North Bernardo Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 04 /
Wesson, Kieron, E. 350 North Bernardo Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 05 /
Mollard, Paul 350 North Bernardo Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2018/46] |
Former [2011/24] | 01 /
Miller, Guy, M. 350 North Bernardo Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
02 /
Hecht, Sidney, M. Department of Chemistry University of Virginia Maccormick Road P.O.Box 400319 Charlottesville, VA 22904-4319 / US | |||
03 /
Jankowski, Orion, D. 350 North Bernardo Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | |||
04 /
Wesson, Kieron, E. 350 North Bernardo Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | |||
05 /
Mollard, Paul 350 North Bernardo Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/46] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/24] | Sexton, Jane Helen J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10015055.6 | 22.02.2007 | [2011/24] | Priority number, date | US20060776028P | 22.02.2006 Original published format: US 776028 P | US20060873395P | 06.12.2006 Original published format: US 873395 P | [2011/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2332534 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2332534 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/355, A61P3/00, A61P25/28, A61K31/05 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
A61K31/05 (EP);
A61K31/355 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
C07C215/56 (EP);
C07C39/08 (EP);
C07C39/11 (EP);
C07C39/19 (EP);
C07C39/245 (EP);
C07C403/04 (EP);
C07C403/08 (EP);
C07C403/18 (EP);
C07C50/02 (EP);
C07C50/06 (EP);
C07C50/24 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/46] |
Former [2011/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Phenol- und Benzoquinonederivate zur Verwendung in der Behandlung von Mitochondriopathien und zur Modulation von Energie-Biomarkern | [2011/24] | English: | Phenol and benzoquinone derivatives for use in the treatment of mitochondrial diseases and modulation of energy biomarkers | [2011/24] | French: | Dérivés du phénol et de la benzoquinone pour leur utilisation dans le traitement des maladies mitochondriales et dans la modulation de biomarqueurs énergétiques | [2018/22] |
Former [2011/24] | Dérivés du phénol et de la benzoquinone pour leur utilisation dans le traitement de maladies mitochondriales et dans la modulation de biomarqueurs énergétiques | Examination procedure | 14.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 23.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07751472.7 / EP1986636 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070751472) is 01.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.07.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.07.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 23.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.05.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2007 | AT | 14.11.2018 | CY | 14.11.2018 | CZ | 14.11.2018 | DK | 14.11.2018 | EE | 14.11.2018 | ES | 14.11.2018 | FI | 14.11.2018 | IT | 14.11.2018 | LT | 14.11.2018 | LV | 14.11.2018 | MC | 14.11.2018 | NL | 14.11.2018 | PL | 14.11.2018 | RO | 14.11.2018 | SE | 14.11.2018 | SI | 14.11.2018 | SK | 14.11.2018 | TR | 14.11.2018 | BG | 14.02.2019 | GR | 15.02.2019 | IE | 22.02.2019 | LU | 22.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | IS | 14.03.2019 | PT | 14.03.2019 | [2021/33] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CY | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IE | 22.02.2019 | ||
LU | 22.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IE | 22.02.2019 | ||
LU | 22.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IE | 22.02.2019 | ||
LU | 22.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IE | 22.02.2019 | ||
LU | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
LU | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
LU | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 14.11.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - HENDLIN, DAVID ET AL, "Activity of coenzyme Q10 and its analogs in the succinoxidase system of electron transport particles", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY , 235, 1187-91 CODEN: JBCHA3; ISSN: 0021-9258, (1960), XP002630274 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | [I] - JAUSLIN MATTHIAS L ET AL, "Mitochondria-targeted antioxidants protect Friedreich Ataxia fibroblasts from endogenous oxidative stress more effectively than untargeted antioxidants.", THE FASEB JOURNAL : OFFICIAL PUBLICATION OF THE FEDERATION OF AMERICAN SOCIETIES FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY. OCT 2003, (200310), vol. 17, no. 13, ISSN 1530-6860, pages 1972 - 1974, XP002409006 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-2 * | [I] - WALTER L ET AL, "Three classes of ubiquinone analogs regulate the mitochondrial permeability transition pore through a common site", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, INC, US, (20000922), vol. 275, no. 38, doi:10.1074/JBC.M004128200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 29521 - 29527, XP002474841 [I] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M004128200 | [I] - GILLE L ET AL, "Effects of tocopheryl quinone on the heart: Model experiments with xanthine oxidase, heart mitochondria, and isolated perfused rat hearts", FREE RADICAL BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, US, (20010415), vol. 30, no. 8, doi:10.1016/S0891-5849(01)00475-0, ISSN 0891-5849, pages 865 - 876, XP002474923 [I] 1-15 * page 868; compound TQ * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0891-5849(01)00475-0 | [A] - LIPSHUTZ B H ET AL, "An Expeditious Route to CoQn, Vitamins K1 and K2, and Related Allylated para-Quinones Utilizing Ni(0) Catalysis", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980212), vol. 54, no. 7, doi:10.1016/S0040-4020(97)10222-8, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 1241 - 1253, XP004107470 [A] 1-15 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(97)10222-8 | by applicant | WO2004003565 | US2005043553 | US2005065099 | US2005067303 | - Approaches to the Controlled Delivery of Drugs, NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (1987), vol. 507 | - LIPSHUTZ, B.H., JAM. CHEM. SOC., (1996), vol. 118, pages 5512 - 5513 | - BELL, S., SCIENCE, (2006), vol. 311, pages 642 - 644 | - LIPSHUTZ, B.H. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1998), vol. 54, pages 1241 - 1253 | - TET.LETT, (1989), vol. 30, no. 29, pages 3749 - 3752 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2005), vol. 127, no. 42, pages 14911 - 14921 | - TET. LETT., (1993), vol. 34, no. 10, pages 1681 - 1684 | - ORG. SYN., (2006), vol. 83, pages 38 - 44 | - JAUSLIN ET AL., HUM. MOL. GENET., (2002), vol. 11, no. 24, page 3055 | - JAUSLIN ET AL., FASEB J., (2003), vol. 17, pages 1972 - 4 | - MUNNICH ET AL., J. INHERIT. METAB. DIS., (1992), vol. 15, no. 4, pages 448 - 55 | - CHARIOT ET AL., ARCH. PATHOL. LAB. MED., (1994), vol. 118, no. 7, pages 695 - 7 | - CHARIOT ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1994), vol. 37, no. 4, pages 583 - 6 | - UEDA ET AL., J. CARDIOL., (1997), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 95 - 102 | - ERHOLA ET AL., FEBS, (1997), vol. 409, no. 2, pages 287 - 91 | - HONDA ET AL., LEUK: RES., (2000), vol. 24, no. 6, pages 461 - 8 | - PILGER ET AL., FREE RADIC. RES., (2001), vol. 35, no. 3, pages 273 - 80 | - KIM ET AL., ENVIRON HEALTH PERSPECT, (2004), vol. 112, no. 6, pages 666 - 71 | - KAUFMANN ET AL., NEUROLOGY, (2004), vol. 62, no. 8, pages 1297 - 302 | - MATTHEWS ET AL., ANN. NEUROL., (1991), vol. 29, no. 4, pages 435 - 8 | - BARBIROLI ET AL., J. NEUROL., (1995), vol. 242, no. 7, pages 472 - 7 | - FABRIZI ET AL., J. NEUROL. SCI., (1996), vol. 137, no. 1, pages 20 - 7 | - TAIVASSALO ET AL., BRAIN, (2003), vol. 126, pages 413 - 23 | - TAIVASSALO ET AL., ANN. NEUROL., (2002), vol. 51, no. 1, pages 38 - 44 | - LYNCH ET AL., MUSCLE NERVE, (2002), vol. 25, no. 5, pages 664 - 73 | - VAN BEEKVELT ET AL., ANN. NEUROL., (1999), vol. 46, no. 4, pages 667 - 70 | - ROLFE, P., "ln vivo near-infrared spectroscopy", ANNU. REV. BIOMED. ENG., (2000), vol. 2, pages 715 - 54 | - STRANGMAN ET AL., "Non-invasive neuroimaging using near-infrared light", BIOL. PSYCHIATRY, (2002), vol. 52, pages 679 - 93 | - LEE, DIFFUSION-CONTROLLED MATRIX SYSTEMS, pages 155 - 198 | - RON; LANGER, ERODIBLE SYSTEMS, pages 199 - 224 | - Methods in Cell Biology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1976), vol. XIV, page 33 |