EP2431061 - Valve model for producing scaffolds for artificial heart valves and vascular structures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eidgenössische Technische Hochschule Zürich Rämistrasse 101 8092 Zürich / CH | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neuenschwander, Peter Hägelerstrasse 4 5400 Baden / CH | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 10015465.7 | 09.06.2006 | [2012/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2431061 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2431061 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/38, A61L27/58, A61L27/56, A61L27/18, A61F2/24 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
A61F2/2415 (EP,US);
A61L27/18 (EP,US);
A61L27/3804 (EP,US);
A61L27/3808 (EP,US);
A61L27/3843 (EP,US);
A61L27/56 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/18, C08L67/04 (US,EP);
A61L27/18, C08L75/04 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Klappenmodell zur Herstellung von Gerüsten für künstliche Herzklappen und Gefäßstrukturen | [2012/12] | English: | Valve model for producing scaffolds for artificial heart valves and vascular structures | [2012/12] | French: | Modèle de vanne pour produire des bases pour valvules cardiaques artificielles et structures de valvules | [2012/12] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/34] | 25.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/34] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06011911.2 / EP1864687 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060011911) is 10.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3655306 (ROSS DONALD NIXON, et al) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 40 - line 68; figures 1,2,4 ** column 2, line 4 - line 26 *; | [XD]EP0696605 (NEUENSCHWANDER PETER [CH], et al) [XD] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1452189 (EIDGENOESS TECH HOCHSCHULE [CH], et al) [A] 1-11 * claim - *; | [A]EP1452190 (EIDGENOESS TECH HOCHSCHULE [CH], et al) [A] 1-11 * claim - *; | [A]US2004254640 (SUTHERLAND FRASER W H [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0059]; figure 3 *; | [XD]WO2005007210 (EIDGENOESS TECH HOCHSCHULE [CH], et al) [XD] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005106090 (UNIV EINDHOVEN TECH [NL], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 6, paragraph 5 - page 7, paragraph L; figures 1-3 * * page 4, paragraph 4 * * page 3, paragraph 2 * | by applicant | EP0696605 | WO2005007210 |