12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
04.09.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
19.06.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
10.01.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
16.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
02.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
01.02.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
25.01.2013 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
24.01.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.01.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.09.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.06.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] |
08.06.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] |
11.05.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
09.05.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.10.2011 |
Publication of search report |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
07.10.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
20.05.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] |