EP2335763 - Catheter including composite guide and methods for use and manufacturing of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medrad, Inc. One Medrad Drive Indianola, PA 15051 / US | [2013/10] |
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states Medrad, Inc. One Medrad Drive Indianola, PA 15051 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonnette, Michael, J. 2733 2nd Avenue South Minneapolis 55408 MN / US | 02 /
Thor, Eric, J. 1707 Glenview Avenue Arden Hills 55112 MN / US | 03 /
Morris, David, B. 1230 Oakwood Circle Anoka 55202 MN / US | 04 /
Bronstad, Jason, M. 23537 Eidelweiss St. NW St. Francis 55070 MN / US | 05 /
Rasch, Corey 703 Maple Street West Stillwater 55082 MN / US | 06 /
Bruckner, Brian, D. 12201 86th Avenue North Maple Grove 55369 MN / US | 07 /
Anderson, Jason 4762 Dominick Way Minnetonka 55343 MN / US | 08 /
Farago, Laszio, T. 875 Alex Lane Hudson 54016 WI / US | 09 /
Dutcher, Diana 14178 88th Place N. Maple Grove 55369 MN / US | [2011/25] | Representative(s) | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Hepworth Browne 15 St Paul's Street Leeds LS1 2JG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Hepworth Browne Pearl Chambers 22 East Parade Leeds LS1 5BY / GB | ||
Former [2011/25] | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10015731.2 | 16.12.2010 | [2011/25] | Priority number, date | US20090286849P | 16.12.2009 Original published format: US 286849 P | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2335763 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2335763 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2335763 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/3203 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
A61B17/32037 (EP,US);
A61M25/00 (CN);
A61B2017/00849 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0062 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/25] | A61M25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/25] | Title | German: | Katheter, der eine Kompositführung beinhaltet, und Verfahren zu dessen Verwendung und Herstellung | [2011/25] | English: | Catheter including composite guide and methods for use and manufacturing of the same | [2011/25] | French: | Cathéter incluant un guide composite et procédés d'utilisation et de fabrication | [2011/25] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 18.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13151693.2 / EP2583714 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.03.2013 | AT | 06.03.2013 | BE | 06.03.2013 | CY | 06.03.2013 | LV | 06.03.2013 | MK | 06.03.2013 | MT | 06.03.2013 | SM | 06.03.2013 | IS | 06.07.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/41] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MK | 06.03.2013 | ||
MT | 06.03.2013 | ||
SM | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MK | 06.03.2013 | ||
SM | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SM | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SM | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 06.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006129091 (BONNETTE MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1,4-13* paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0072]; figures 1-10 * |