EP2299429 - Semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | [2012/03] |
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co, Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Hajime Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd. 398, Hase, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0036 / JP | [2012/03] |
Former [2011/12] | 01 /
Kimura, Hajime Semiconductor Energy Lab. Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 2430036 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10015781.7 | 06.05.2004 | [2011/12] | Priority number, date | JP20030136612 | 14.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003136612 | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2299429 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2299429 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32, G05F3/24 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP,KR,US);
G05F3/242 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2300/0809 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2300/0833 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2300/0842 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2300/0861 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL [2011/12] | Title | German: | Halbleiterbauelement | [2011/12] | English: | Semiconductor device | [2011/12] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur | [2011/12] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 22.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04731468.7 / EP1624358 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040731468) is 18.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 16.05.2012 | NL | 16.05.2012 | [2013/08] |
Former [2012/48] | FI | 16.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5646518 (LAKSHMIKUMAR KADABA R [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 46 - column 6, line 7; figures 1-2 * [I] 4-8; | [XI]US6489835 (YU QUAN [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 35 - column 4, line 4; figure 3 * [I] 2,4-8; | [X]US2001032990 (KOYAMA YOSHIKI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0010]; claims 1,9 *; | [X]US5744984 (DRAPAC GEORGE A [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 4, lines 49-54 - column 7, lines 45-52; figures 1,5,6 *; | [X]US6316990 (TANIZAWA YUKIHIKO [JP]) [X] 1 * column 7, lines 37-46; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US6087821 (KOJIMA SHINICHI [JP]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 41 - column 10, line 29; figures 2,3; claims 1,5 *; | [X]JPH11149783 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US6285177 (MALLIKARJUNASWAMY SHEKAR [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5614848 (KAMINAGA YASUO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5666035 (BASIRE ALAIN [FR], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2002517806 | WO0106484 | JP2002514320 | WO0239420 | WO03038796 | WO03038797 | WO03038793 | WO03038794 | WO03038795 | JP2001005426 | JP2001343933 |