EP2301823 - Parking assistant and parking assisting method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Masayasu c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 02 /
Akatsuka, Takeshi c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 03 /
Kawai, Satoshi c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 04 /
Nakano, Yoshinori c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 05 /
Seguchi, Hidenori c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | [2012/47] |
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
Suzuki, Masayasu c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | ||
02 /
Akatsuka, Takeshi c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | |||
03 /
Kawai, Satoshi c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | |||
04 /
Nakano, Yoshinori c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | |||
05 /
Seguchi, Hidenori c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | Representative(s) | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [2012/47] |
Former [2011/13] | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10015986.2 | 22.09.2008 | [2011/13] | Priority number, date | JP20070257986 | 01.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007257986 | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2301823 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2301823 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B62D15/02 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
B62D15/0275 (EP,US);
B62D15/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | Parkassistent und Parkassistenzverfahren | [2011/13] | English: | Parking assistant and parking assisting method | [2011/13] | French: | Dispositif et procédé d'aide au stationnement | [2011/13] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 23.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08836709.9 / EP2212182 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080836709) is 07.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2008 | AT | 21.11.2012 | BE | 21.11.2012 | CY | 21.11.2012 | CZ | 21.11.2012 | DK | 21.11.2012 | EE | 21.11.2012 | FI | 21.11.2012 | HR | 21.11.2012 | IS | 21.11.2012 | IT | 21.11.2012 | LT | 21.11.2012 | LV | 21.11.2012 | MC | 21.11.2012 | MT | 21.11.2012 | NL | 21.11.2012 | PL | 21.11.2012 | RO | 21.11.2012 | SE | 21.11.2012 | SI | 21.11.2012 | SK | 21.11.2012 | TR | 21.11.2012 | BG | 21.02.2013 | NO | 21.02.2013 | GR | 22.02.2013 | ES | 04.03.2013 | PT | 21.03.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 22.09.2008 | |
AT | 21.11.2012 | ||
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 21.11.2012 | |
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 21.11.2012 | |
NO | 21.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1442962 (TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI KK [JP]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0119] - [0121] *; | [A]GB2409921 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,9 * abstract ** page 16, lines 11-16 * | by applicant | JPH11208420 | JP2003104149 | EP1442962 | EP1462342 | JP20070257986 |