EP2469951 - Method and apparatus for distance-based resource scheduling in heterogeneous cellular networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CommAgility Limited Holywell Park Loughborough LE11 3AQ / GB | [2015/50] |
Former [2012/26] | For all designated states MIMOON GmbH Technologiezentrum für Duisburg Bismarckstrasse 120 47057 Duisburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wu, Hanguang Holteistrasse 12 47057 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
Mulder, Willem c/o MimoOn GmbH Technologiezentrum für Duisburg Bismarckstrasse 120 47057 Duisburg / DE | 03 /
Marandin, Dimitry Richard-Dehmel-Strasse 6 47057 Duisburg / DE | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10015988.8 | 22.12.2010 | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2469951 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/08, // H04W84/04 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
H04W72/541 (EP);
H04W84/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur entfernungsbasierten Ressourcenplanung in heterogenen zellularen Netzwerken | [2012/26] | English: | Method and apparatus for distance-based resource scheduling in heterogeneous cellular networks | [2012/26] | French: | Procédé et appareil de planification de ressource en fonction de la distance dans des réseaux cellulaires hétérogènes | [2012/26] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 23.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/35] | 20.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 01.07.2014 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2015/36] | 02.11.2015 | Resumption of proceedings | [2015/36] |