blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2233540

EP2233540 - Method of gravure printing with liquid radiation curable inks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.10.2011
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.11.2011  [2011/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ideon LLC
249 Homestead Road Building 5 Unit 1
Hillsborough NJ New Jersey 08844 / US
For all designated states
Amgraph Packaging Inc.
90 Versailles Road
Versailles CT 06383 / US
[2010/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Laksin, Mikhail
29 Kincaid Road
Boonton New Jersey 07075 / US
02 / Chatterjee, Subhankar
60 Norma Road
Hampton, New Jersey 08827 / US
03 / Fontaine, Kenneth A.
286 Osbrook Point Road
Pawcatuck, Connecticut 06379 / US
 [2010/39]
Representative(s)Blokland, Arie, et al
Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau
P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2010/39]Blokland, Arie, et al
Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date10075122.122.03.2010
[2010/39]
Priority number, dateUS2009040970124.03.2009         Original published format: US 409701
[2010/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2233540
Date:29.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2010
ClassificationIPC:C09D11/10
[2010/39]
CPC:
C09D11/101 (EP,US); B41M1/10 (EP); B41M7/00 (EP);
B41M7/0081 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2010/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Tiefdruckverfahren mit strahlungshärtbaren flüssigen Tinten[2010/39]
English:Method of gravure printing with liquid radiation curable inks[2010/39]
French:Procédé d'impression de gravure avec encres durcissables à radiation liquide[2010/39]
Examination procedure30.03.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/47]
10.05.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2011/47]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2005056702  (SUN CHEMICAL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 4, line 13 - line 18 * * page 9, line 35 - line 36 * * page 18, line 18 - line 22; example -; claim - * [Y] 9-15;
 [XYI]US2003154871  (LAKSIN MIKHAIL [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0020] , [0032] , [0062]; figures 1,2; example -; claim - * [Y] 9-15 [I] 9-15;
 [X]US4927663  (SMALL RICHARD F [GB], et al) [X] 1-8 * example 8; claim 10 *;
 [X]CN101134864  (SHANXI DISTILLATE SCIENCE INDU [CN]) [X] 1-8 * abstract *
by applicantUS6772683
 US2008233306
 US6803112
 US6011078
 US2006165997
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.