Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
29.10.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.04.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
18.03.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.03.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.02.2012 | Change - representative | published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] |
11.02.2011 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] |
03.09.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] |