EP2314830 - Tractor communications/control and select fire perforating switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hunting Titan, Inc. 2 Northpoint Drive, Suite 400 Houston, Texas 77060-3236 / US | [2014/15] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states Hunting Titan, Ltd. 11785 Highway 152 Pampa TX 79065 / US | ||
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Titan Specialities, Ltd. 11785 Highway 152 Pampa, TX 79065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brooks, James E. 9520 Oak Crest Drive Manvel, TX 77578 / US | 02 /
Lerche, Nolan C. 12114 Dorrance Stafford, TX 77477 / US | 03 /
Larsen, Jesper Oluf Strandparksvej 7 2665 Vallensbaek Strand / DK | 04 /
Thomsen, Brian Faergevej 89 3600 Frederikssund / DK | 05 /
Larsen, Kasper Juul Gaardstedet 41, 2 Tv. 2500 Valby / DK | [2011/17] | Representative(s) | Akers, Noel James N.J. Akers & Co 63 Lemon Street Truro, TR1 2PN / GB | [2014/11] |
Former [2011/17] | Akers, Noel James N.J. Akers & Co. 7 Ferris Town Truro Cornwall TR1 3JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 10075761.6 | 07.01.2008 | [2011/17] | Priority number, date | US20070879169P | 06.01.2007 Original published format: US 879169 P | [2011/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2314830 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2314830 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/12, E21B43/116, E21B43/1185, // E21B23/00 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
E21B43/116 (EP,US);
E21B47/12 (EP,US);
E21B23/001 (EP,US);
E21B43/11857 (EP,US);
E21B44/00 (US);
E21B47/024 (US);
E21B47/13 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/17] | Title | German: | Traktorkommunikation/-steuerung und Auswahlschalter für die Abfeuerungsperforierung | [2011/17] | English: | Tractor communications/control and select fire perforating switch | [2011/17] | French: | Communication/commande de tracteur et commutateur de perforation par tir sélectif | [2011/17] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 05.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08754055.5 / EP2106494 | Divisional application(s) | EP11075202.9 / EP2402555 | EP11075204.5 / EP2402556 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080754055) is 09.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 23.01.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 23.01.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.02.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.01.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 23.01.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.02.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.01.2008 | AT | 12.03.2014 | BE | 12.03.2014 | CY | 12.03.2014 | CZ | 12.03.2014 | DK | 12.03.2014 | EE | 12.03.2014 | ES | 12.03.2014 | FI | 12.03.2014 | HR | 12.03.2014 | IT | 12.03.2014 | LT | 12.03.2014 | LV | 12.03.2014 | MC | 12.03.2014 | MT | 12.03.2014 | RO | 12.03.2014 | SI | 12.03.2014 | SK | 12.03.2014 | TR | 12.03.2014 | BG | 12.06.2014 | GR | 13.06.2014 | IS | 12.07.2014 | PT | 14.07.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2340157 (SCHLUMBERGER HOLDINGS [VG]) [A] 1,5,7,9,15 * the whole document *; | [A]US6604584 (LERCHE NOLAN C [US], et al) [A] 1,5,7,9,15* the whole document *; | [I]US2004108114 (LERCHE NOLAN C [US], et al) [I] 7-14 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0024] - [0028] * * claims 13,14 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2005045331 (LERCHE NOLAN C [US], et al) [X] 1-6,15,16 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] , [0049] - [0054] * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US6938689 (FARRANT SIMON L [US], et al) [A] 1,5,7,9,15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US20070879169 |