EP2355035 - Method for automatic development of an art index [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states artnet AG Oranienstraße 164 10969 Berlin / DE | [2011/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neuendorf, Hans Bayerische Straße 31 10707, Berlin / DE | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | Weisse, Renate Bleibtreustraße 38 10623 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | Weisse, Renate Patentanwälte Weisse & Wolgast Bleibtreustrasse 38 10623 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 10150030.4 | 04.01.2010 | [2011/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2355035 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q40/00 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
G06Q40/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur automatischen Entwicklung eines Kunstindexes | [2011/32] | English: | Method for automatic development of an art index | [2011/32] | French: | Procédé de développement automatique d'un indice artistique | [2011/32] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/34] | 04.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |