EP2178179 - USB connector and USB device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Device Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2013/17] |
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states Huawei Device Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhao, Menglong Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District 518129, Shenzhen Guangdong / CN | 02 /
Zhang, Bin Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District 518129, Shenzhen Guangdong / CN | [2013/17] |
Former [2010/16] | 01 /
Zhao, Menglong Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District 518129, Shenzhen Guangdong / CN | ||
02 /
Zhang, Bin Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District 518129, Shenzhen Guangdong / CN | Representative(s) | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Dessauerstrasse 3 80992 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/16] | Charles, Glyndwr Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10150216.9 | 19.02.2009 | [2010/16] | Priority number, date | CN20081006325 | 26.02.2008 Original published format: CN200810006325 | [2010/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2178179 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2178179 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | [2010/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2178179 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/64, H01R35/04, H01R24/00, H01R13/658, H01R13/646, // H01R13/58, H01R13/642, H01R13/66 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
H01R13/6594 (EP,US);
H01R13/64 (EP,US);
H01R35/04 (EP,US);
H01R13/5845 (EP,US);
H01R13/642 (EP,US);
H01R13/6471 (EP,US);
H01R13/6485 (EP,US);
H01R13/6658 (EP,US);
Y10S439/936 (EP,US);
Y10S439/947 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/17] | H01R13/64, H01R35/04, H01R24/00, H01R13/658, // H01R13/58, H01R13/642, H01R13/66 | ||
Former IPC [2010/16] | H01R35/04, H01R24/00, H01R13/658, // H01R13/58, H01R13/64, H01R13/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/16] | Title | German: | USB-Steckverbinder und USB-Gerät | [2010/16] | English: | USB connector and USB device | [2010/16] | French: | Connecteur USB et dispositif USB | [2012/09] |
Former [2010/16] | Connecteur US et dispositif USB | Examination procedure | 18.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 14.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2012 | Observations by third parties | 24.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09153153.3 / EP2096724 | Divisional application(s) | EP11154365.8 / EP2315323 | EP11187985.4 / EP2416456 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090153153) is 30.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.02.2009 | AT | 24.04.2013 | BE | 24.04.2013 | CY | 24.04.2013 | CZ | 24.04.2013 | DK | 24.04.2013 | EE | 24.04.2013 | HR | 24.04.2013 | LT | 24.04.2013 | LV | 24.04.2013 | MC | 24.04.2013 | MK | 24.04.2013 | MT | 24.04.2013 | NL | 24.04.2013 | PL | 24.04.2013 | RO | 24.04.2013 | SI | 24.04.2013 | SK | 24.04.2013 | TR | 24.04.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | NO | 24.07.2013 | GR | 25.07.2013 | IS | 24.08.2013 | PT | 26.08.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 19.02.2009 | |
AT | 24.04.2013 | ||
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
MT | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
TR | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 19.02.2009 | |
AT | 24.04.2013 | ||
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
MT | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
MT | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 24.04.2013 | |
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5938476 (WU KUN-TSAN [TW], et al) [Y] 6,22 * column 2, lines 24-40 * * column 3, lines 11-53 * * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US2002045385 (WANG HUAWEI [CN]) [Y] 3,4,19,20 * paragraphs [0014] - [0019] * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2004033727 (KAO CHI-LEI [TW]) [Y] 1,2,5,15-22 * paragraphs [0040] , [0043] , [0045] , [0046] * * figures 7,8,10 *; | [Y]US2004215966 (ELTETO LASZLO [US]) [Y] 1-7,13-18,21,23,29,30 * paragraphs [0020] - [0027] * * figures 3A-6 *; | [A]US2007032101 (CUELLAR EDWIN J [US], et al) [A] 1,2,16,17 * paragraph [0046] * * figure 7 *; | [A]US2007141915 (KIM MYUNGGU [KR]) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0054] - [0056] ** figure 6 *; | [YA]GB2439252 (TAIGUEN TECHNOLOGY [CN]) [Y] 7,13,14,23,29,30 * fourth and fifth embodiment; page 5 * * figures 7-9 * [A] 1-3,5,15-18 | Examination | CN1433262 | US2004048494 | CN1734860 | CN2777798Y | other | CN2777798K | CN1433262 | US2004048494 | CN2777798Y |