EP2207259 - System for common-mode voltage reduction in AC drives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/28] | Systems and methods for common-mode voltage reduction in AC drives | ||
[2018/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US | [2010/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tallam, Rangarajan W174 N10222 Tanglewood Drive Germantown, WI 53022 / US | 02 /
Kerkman, Russel 6815 W Howard Avenue Milwaukee, WI 532201-1809 / US | 03 /
Leggate, David 14065 W Fieldpointe Dr. New Berlin, WI 53151-1238 / US | [2019/16] |
Former [2010/28] | 01 /
Tallam, Rangarajan W174 N10222 Tanglewood Drive Germantown, WI 53022 / US | ||
02 /
Kerkman, Russel 6815 W Howard Avenue Milwaukee, WI 532201-1809 / US | |||
03 /
Leggate, David 14065 W Fieldpointe Dr. New Berlin, WI 53151-1238 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/16] |
Former [2010/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10150260.7 | 07.01.2010 | [2010/28] | Priority number, date | US20090394613 | 27.02.2009 Original published format: US 394613 | US20090143028P | 07.01.2009 Original published format: US 143028 P | [2010/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2207259 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2207259 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2207259 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/5387, H02M1/44, H02M1/12 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
H02M1/44 (EP,US);
H02M7/5387 (EP,US);
H02M7/53876 (EP,US);
H02M1/123 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/28] | H02M7/5387, H02M1/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] |
Former [2010/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | System zur Verringerung der Gleichtaktspannung in Wechselstromantrieben | [2018/39] | English: | System for common-mode voltage reduction in AC drives | [2018/39] | French: | Système pour la réduction de la tension en mode commun dans des entraînements CA | [2018/39] |
Former [2010/28] | Systeme und Verfahren zur Verringerung der Gleichtaktspannung in Wechselstromantrieben | ||
Former [2010/28] | Systems and methods for common-mode voltage reduction in AC drives | ||
Former [2010/28] | Systèmes et procédés pour la réduction de la tension en mode commun dans des entraînements CA | Examination procedure | 07.01.2010 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 28.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2018 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.01.2010 | AT | 17.04.2019 | CY | 17.04.2019 | CZ | 17.04.2019 | DK | 17.04.2019 | EE | 17.04.2019 | ES | 17.04.2019 | FI | 17.04.2019 | HR | 17.04.2019 | IT | 17.04.2019 | LT | 17.04.2019 | LV | 17.04.2019 | MC | 17.04.2019 | MK | 17.04.2019 | MT | 17.04.2019 | NL | 17.04.2019 | PL | 17.04.2019 | RO | 17.04.2019 | SE | 17.04.2019 | SI | 17.04.2019 | SK | 17.04.2019 | SM | 17.04.2019 | TR | 17.04.2019 | BG | 17.07.2019 | NO | 17.07.2019 | GR | 18.07.2019 | IS | 17.08.2019 | PT | 17.08.2019 | IE | 07.01.2020 | LU | 07.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 07.01.2010 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CY | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
MT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
IE | 07.01.2020 | ||
LU | 07.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
IE | 07.01.2020 | ||
LU | 07.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
LU | 07.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 17.04.2019 | |
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 17.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1858150 (ROCKWELL AUTOMATION TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2,7-21,24 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0006] , [0007] , [0063] , [0071] - [0115] *; | [AD]US7164254 (KERKMAN RUSSEL J [US], et al) [AD] 1-10 * figures 1,2,10-19 * * column 6, line 29 - column 8, line 24 * | by applicant | US7164254 | US7106025 | US6819070 | US7034501 |