EP2211240 - Intermediate transfer components containing carbon black surface-treated with polypyrrole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2016/41] |
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wu, Jin 125 Woodgreen Drive Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | [2016/41] |
Former [2010/30] | 01 /
Wu, Jin 125 Woodgreen Drive Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/41] |
Former [2012/02] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/40] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/30] | De Anna, Pier Luigi Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10150825.7 | 15.01.2010 | [2010/30] | Priority number, date | US20090360307 | 27.01.2009 Original published format: US 360307 | [2010/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2211240 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2211240 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/16 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
G03G15/162 (EP,US);
G03G2215/1623 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] |
Former [2010/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Zwischenübertragungselement , das ein mit Polypyrrol oberflächenbehandeltes Carbon Black enthält. | [2010/30] | English: | Intermediate transfer components containing carbon black surface-treated with polypyrrole | [2010/30] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE TRANSFERT INTERMÉDIAIRE COMPRENANT UN CARBON BLACK DONT LA SURFACE EST TRAITEE AVEC DU POLYPYRROLE | [2016/22] |
Former [2010/30] | Élément de transfert intermédiaire comprenant un carbon black dont la surface est traitee avec du polypyrrole | Examination procedure | 06.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 05.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.01.2010 | AT | 12.10.2016 | BE | 12.10.2016 | CY | 12.10.2016 | CZ | 12.10.2016 | DK | 12.10.2016 | EE | 12.10.2016 | ES | 12.10.2016 | FI | 12.10.2016 | HR | 12.10.2016 | IT | 12.10.2016 | LT | 12.10.2016 | LV | 12.10.2016 | MC | 12.10.2016 | MK | 12.10.2016 | NL | 12.10.2016 | PL | 12.10.2016 | RO | 12.10.2016 | SE | 12.10.2016 | SI | 12.10.2016 | SK | 12.10.2016 | SM | 12.10.2016 | TR | 12.10.2016 | BG | 12.01.2017 | NO | 12.01.2017 | GR | 13.01.2017 | IE | 15.01.2017 | LU | 15.01.2017 | MT | 15.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | IS | 12.02.2017 | PT | 13.02.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 15.01.2010 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IE | 15.01.2017 | ||
LU | 15.01.2017 | ||
MT | 15.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 15.01.2010 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IE | 15.01.2017 | ||
LU | 15.01.2017 | ||
MT | 15.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.01.2010 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IE | 15.01.2017 | ||
LU | 15.01.2017 | ||
MT | 15.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IE | 15.01.2017 | ||
LU | 15.01.2017 | ||
MT | 15.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IE | 15.01.2017 | ||
LU | 15.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
LU | 15.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 12.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006269864 (TARNAWSKYJ IHOR W [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7,9,12,13,15 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1, paragraph 9 * * page 4, paragraph 28 * * page 6, paragraph 44 * * page 6, paragraph 48 * * claims 1,2,14 * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0027] * * page 42 *; | [X]US2003144388 (SWIFT JOSEPH A [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0056] * * claims 1,5 *; | [A]US2005095437 (FURUYA SATORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 46; figure 21 * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1, paragraph 4 * * page 1, paragraph 6 * * page 5, paragraph 72 * * page 6, paragraph 84 * * page 6, paragraph 86 *; | [A]US2004179871 (FUKUDA SHIGERU [JP]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, paragraph 56 * * page 1, paragraph 8 - paragraph 9 * * page 1, paragraph 3 * | by applicant | US6397034 | US7031647 | US7139519 | US7130569 | US5487707 | US6318223 | US6440515 | US6602156 | US20080129995 | US20080181354 | US20080181409 |