EP2184058 - Drug coating providing high drug loading and methods for providing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 05.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALZA Corporation 1900 Charleston Avenue, P.O. Box 7210 Mountain View, CA 94039 / US | [2011/36] |
Former [2010/19] | For all designated states ALZA Corporation 1900 Charleston Road P.O. Box 7210 Mountain View, CA 94039-7210 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cruz, Evangeline 3889 Blackstone Court Hayward, CA 94542 / US | 02 /
Ruhlmann, Gregory 18600 Barnhart Avenue Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
Pollock, Brenda 7520 Kirwin Lane Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
Li, Sherry 20727 Garden Crest Court Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 05 /
Garcia, Carmelita 36342 Tunbridge Drive Newark, CA 94560 / US | 06 /
Wong, Alfredo, M. 778 E. Homestand Road Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 07 /
Bronz, Ryan 931 Brookgrove Lane Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 08 /
Fink, Tracy 150 W. Rincon Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 09 /
Edgren, David 277 N. Avalon Drive Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | [2012/06] |
Former [2010/19] | 01 /
Cruz, Evangeline 3889 Blackstone Court Hayward, CA 94542 / US | ||
02 /
Ruhlmann, Gregory 18600 Barnhart Avenue Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
03 /
Pollock, Brenda 7520 Kirwin Lane Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
04 /
Li, Sherry 20727 Garden Crest Court Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
05 /
Garcia, Carmelita 36342 Tunbridge Drive Newark, CA 94560 / US | |||
06 /
Wong, Alfredo, M. 778 E. Homestand Road Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | |||
07 /
Bronz, Ryan 931 Brookgrove Lane Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
08 /
Fink, Tracy 150 W. Rincon Campbell, CA 95008 / US | |||
09 /
Edgren, David 277 N. Avalon Drive Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | Representative(s) | Suèr, Steven Johannes, et al Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/19] | Suèr, Steven Johannes, et al Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London W1U 6FQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10151011.3 | 23.09.2004 | [2010/19] | Priority number, date | US20030506195P | 26.09.2003 Original published format: US 506195 P | [2010/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2184058 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2184058 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K9/16, A61K9/28, A61K31/167, A61K31/165, A61K31/485, A61K9/48 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K9/28 (KR);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/485 (EP,US);
A61K9/0004 (EP,US);
A61K9/1676 (EP,US);
A61K9/20 (KR);
A61K9/209 (EP,US);
A61K9/2886 (EP,US);
A61K9/48 (KR);
A61K9/4808 (EP,US);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61K9/2086 (EP,US);
A61K9/5084 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/165, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/167, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/485, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/19] | A61K9/24, A61K9/36, A61K31/167, A61K31/485 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/19] | Title | German: | Arzneistoffcoating mit hohem Wirkstoffanteil sowie Methoden zu dessen Herstellung | [2010/20] | English: | Drug coating providing high drug loading and methods for providing the same | [2010/19] | French: | Enrobage de médicaments à charge médicamenteuse élevée et procès de fabrication | [2011/36] |
Former [2010/19] | Arzneimittelbeschichtung mit hoher Arzneimittelbeladung und Verfahren dafür | ||
Former [2010/19] | Enrobage de medicaments a charge medicamenteuse elevee et procedes de fabrication | Examination procedure | 12.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 29.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 19.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04821250.0 / EP1708684 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040821250) is 27.10.2006 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.09.2004 | AT | 08.02.2012 | BE | 08.02.2012 | CY | 08.02.2012 | CZ | 08.02.2012 | DK | 08.02.2012 | EE | 08.02.2012 | FI | 08.02.2012 | IT | 08.02.2012 | NL | 08.02.2012 | PL | 08.02.2012 | RO | 08.02.2012 | SE | 08.02.2012 | SI | 08.02.2012 | SK | 08.02.2012 | TR | 08.02.2012 | BG | 08.05.2012 | GR | 09.05.2012 | ES | 19.05.2012 | PT | 08.06.2012 | IE | 23.09.2012 | LU | 23.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
TR | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 23.09.2012 | ||
LU | 23.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
TR | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 23.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 23.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | NL | 08.02.2012 | |
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | NL | 08.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4946685 (EDGREN DAVID E [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * column 12, line 26 - line 29 * * examples 28,29 * * claim 1 * * column 7, line 3 - line 23 *; | [A]WO9944591 (ALZA CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * examples 2,3 *; | [A]EP0958812 (FREUNT IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13* example 4 *; | [Y]US2003092724 (KAO HUAIHUNG [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * examples 1,2 * * claims 1-11,15,29 * * claims 21-27 * | by applicant | US4235236 | US4278087 | US4576604 | US4663149 | US4717569 | US4763405 | US4777049 | US4801461 | US4854470 | US4961932 | US5023088 | US5030456 | US5221536 | US5245357 | US5273760 | US5286493 | US5407686 | WO9534285 | WO9610996 | US5512299 | US5534263 | US5614578 | US5667804 | US5830502 | US5858407 | US5906832 | US5948747 | WO9955313 | US5998478 | US6004582 | US6020000 | WO0035426 | US6136345 | US6153678 | US6174547 | US6183466 | US6245357 | WO0151038 | US6316028 | US6365183 | US2002071863 | US2003198619 | US2003232078 | WO2004002448 |