EP2354744 - Cooling element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Technology Oy Valimopolku 4 A 00380 Helsinki / FI | [2017/38] |
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states ABB Oy Strömbergintie 1 00380 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seväkivi, Pertti Lehdokintie 24 01830 Lepsämä / FI | [2017/38] |
Former [2011/32] | 01 /
Seväkivi, Pertti Lehdokintie 24 01830 Lepsämä / FI | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2017/38] | Kolster Oy Ab Salmisaarenaukio 1 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2013/43] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2011/32] | Holmström, Stefan Mikael Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 10151195.4 | 20.01.2010 | [2011/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2354744 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2354744 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F28D15/02, F28F1/02, H01L23/427 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
F28D15/02 (EP,US);
F28F1/022 (EP,US);
H01L23/473 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/38] |
Former [2011/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Kühlelement | [2011/32] | English: | Cooling element | [2011/32] | French: | Élément de refroidissement | [2011/32] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 30.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.01.2010 | AT | 20.09.2017 | CY | 20.09.2017 | CZ | 20.09.2017 | DK | 20.09.2017 | EE | 20.09.2017 | ES | 20.09.2017 | HR | 20.09.2017 | LT | 20.09.2017 | LV | 20.09.2017 | MC | 20.09.2017 | MK | 20.09.2017 | NL | 20.09.2017 | PL | 20.09.2017 | PT | 20.09.2017 | RO | 20.09.2017 | SE | 20.09.2017 | SI | 20.09.2017 | SK | 20.09.2017 | SM | 20.09.2017 | TR | 20.09.2017 | BG | 20.12.2017 | NO | 20.12.2017 | GR | 21.12.2017 | IE | 20.01.2018 | IS | 20.01.2018 | LU | 20.01.2018 | MT | 20.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 20.01.2010 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IE | 20.01.2018 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
LU | 20.01.2018 | ||
MT | 20.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IE | 20.01.2018 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
LU | 20.01.2018 | ||
MT | 20.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IE | 20.01.2018 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
LU | 20.01.2018 | ||
MT | 20.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IE | 20.01.2018 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
LU | 20.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IE | 20.01.2018 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
LU | 20.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
LU | 20.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
LU | 20.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
LU | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | HR | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | HR | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | HR | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | LT | 20.09.2017 | |
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 20.09.2017 | |
NO | 20.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19610851 (CALSONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [IY]JPH0961074 (ACTRONICS KK, et al) [I] 1,3-8 * abstract * [Y] 2; | [A]JP2003148884 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [Y]US2003136548 (PARISH OVERTON L [US], et al) [Y] 2 * figure 4 *; | [A]WO2009113959 (DANAHER MOTION STOCKHOLM AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document * | by applicant | JPH0961074 | US2003136548 |