EP2210719 - Method for the production of components made of wood or plastic [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIESSE S.p.A. Via della Meccanica, 16 Pesaro / IT | [2010/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lattanzi, Lorenzo Via Mazza, 4 61100 Pesaro / IT | [2010/30] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 10151210.1 | 20.01.2010 | [2010/30] | Priority number, date | IT2009BO00024 | 21.01.2009 Original published format: IT BO20090024 | [2010/30] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2210719 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B27B5/065, B23D47/02, B23D47/04, B27C9/04, B27M1/08, B27M3/00 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
B27B5/065 (EP);
B23D47/025 (EP);
B23D47/04 (EP);
B27C9/04 (EP);
B27G19/10 (EP);
B27M1/08 (EP);
B27M3/0006 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Komponenten aus Holz oder Kunststoff | [2010/30] | English: | Method for the production of components made of wood or plastic | [2010/30] | French: | Procédé de production de composants fabriqués en bois ou plastique | [2010/30] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/30] | 08.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE202007010479U (SCHEER & CIE C F [DE]) [X] 1-3,9,13 * the whole document * * in particular: * * paragraphs [0005] , [0017] , [0029] , [0032] - [0035] - [0037] - [0039] * [Y] 4-8,10-12; | [YA]US4736511 (JENKNER ERWIN [DE]) [Y] 4,5 * the whole document * [A] 1-3,6-13; | [YA]US4694871 (JENKNER ERWIN [DE]) [Y] 6-8,12 * in particular: * * column 4, line 38 - line 56 * * column 5, line 38 - line 61 * [A] 1-5,9-11,13; | [Y]EP0208079 (GIBEN IMPIANTI SPA [IT]) [Y] 10,11 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0019292 (GIBEN IMPIANTI SPA [IT]) [Y] 11 * the whole document * * in particular: * * page 6, line 12 - page 8, line 1 * |