Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] |
28.09.2012 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.03.2012 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
11.03.2011 | Change - inventor | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] |
11.03.2011 | Change - inventor | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] |
08.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant | |
04.02.2011 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] |
25.06.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |