EP2211475 - Multi-phase ultra-wideband signal generator using differential pulse oscillators and array thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Advanced Institute of Science and Technology 373-1, Guseong-dong, Yuseong-gu 305-701 Daejeon / KR | [2010/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hong, Seong Cheol No. 101-2304, CJ Nine Parrk Bongmyeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejon 305-101 / KR | 02 /
Sim, Sang Hoon 138-103, Jugong Apt., Dunchon 1-dong 134-771, Gangdong-gu, Seoul / KR | [2011/15] |
Former [2010/30] | 01 /
Hong, Seong Cheol 119-503, Hanbit Apt., Eoeun-dong 305-755, Yuseong-gu, Daejon / KR | ||
02 /
Sim, Sang Hoon 138-103, Jugong Apt., Dunchon 1-dong 134-771, Gangdong-gu, Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10151306.7 | 21.01.2010 | [2010/30] | Priority number, date | KR20090004993 | 21.01.2009 Original published format: KR 20090004993 | KR20090112667 | 20.11.2009 Original published format: KR 20090112667 | [2010/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2211475 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/69, H03B7/06 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
H04B1/7174 (EP,US);
H03B5/1212 (EP,US);
H03B5/1228 (EP,US);
H03B5/1262 (EP,US);
H03B2200/0078 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mehrphasiger Ultrabreitband-Signalerzeuger mit Differentialimpulsoszillatoren und Anordnung davon | [2010/30] | English: | Multi-phase ultra-wideband signal generator using differential pulse oscillators and array thereof | [2010/30] | French: | Générateur de signaux à bande ultra large à phases multiples utilisant des oscillateurs d'impulsion différentiels et réseau correspondant | [2010/30] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 01.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 04.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008042762 (YANG KYOUNG-HOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008]; figure 2 ** paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] *; | [A]WO2008138617 (UNIV DUISBURG ESSEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 1, line 3 - line 19 * * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 27 * | by applicant | US2008042762 | WO2008138617 |