EP2211201 - Method and system for in-field positioning of measurement instruments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ellegi S.r.l. Piazza Velasca, 5 20122 Milano / IT | [2010/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leva, Davide Via Como, 28 21100 Varese / IT | 02 /
Rivolta, Carlo Via Vespucci, 10 20035 Lissone (MB) / IT | [2010/30] | Representative(s) | Cicogna, Franco, et al Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | Cicogna, Franco, et al Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10151467.7 | 22.01.2010 | [2010/30] | Priority number, date | IT2009MI00079 | 23.01.2009 Original published format: IT MI20090079 | [2010/30] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2211201 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/90 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
G01S7/02 (EP,US);
G01S13/9023 (EP,US);
G01S7/4026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Methode und System zur Positionierung von Messgeräten zu Freifeldmessungen | [2010/30] | English: | Method and system for in-field positioning of measurement instruments | [2010/30] | French: | Procédé et système pour le positionnement en champ des instruments de mesure | [2010/30] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 23.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/48] | 10.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - L. NOFERINI ET AL., "Long Term Monitoring of Unstable Slopes by Ground Based Synthetic Aperture Radar: A Case Study in Italy", ESA-ESRIN FRINGE ATSR WORKSHOP 2005, Frascati, (20051202), XP007910217 [X] 3,5,8 * Abstract, Sec. 1, 2.2;; figure 3 * [I] 1,2,4,6,7 | [A] - HOONYOL LEE ET AL., "Development a GB-SAR (I) : System Configuration and Interferometry", KOREAN JOURNAL OF REMOTE SENSING, (2007), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 237 - 245, XP007910218 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - REEVES B A ET AL, "Developments in monitoring mine slope stability using radar interferometry", GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING SYMPOSIUN, 2000. PROCEEDINGS. IGARSS 200 0. IEEE 2000 INTERNATIONAL 24-28 JULY 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20000724), vol. 5, ISBN 9780780363595, pages 2325 - 2327, XP010503983 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IGARSS.2000.858397 | [A] - WADGE G ET AL, "AVTIS: A novel millimetre-wave ground based instrument for volcano remote sensing", JOURNAL OF VOLCANOLOGY AND GEOTHERMAL RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 146, no. 4, ISSN 0377-0273, (20050901), pages 307 - 318, (20050901), XP025392519 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - NOFERINI ET AL, "Using GB-SAR technique to monitor slow moving landslide", ENGINEERING GEOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071116), vol. 95, no. 3-4, ISSN 0013-7952, pages 88 - 98, XP022348686 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.enggeo.2007.09.002 | [A] - LUCA PIPIA ET AL, "Atmospheric Artifact Compensation in Ground-Based DInSAR Applications", IEEE GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20080101), vol. 5, no. 1, ISSN 1545-598X, pages 88 - 92, XP011197100 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LGRS.2007.908364 | [A] - BOERNER W-M ET AL, "Development of a Ground-Based Polarimetric Broadband SAR System for Noninvasive Ground-Truth Validation in Vegetation Monitoring", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20040901), vol. 42, no. 9, ISSN 0196-2892, pages 1803 - 1810, XP011118611 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TGRS.2004.832248 |