EP2213600 - Rewinder and method for winding paper around a core for making a log [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gambini International S.A. 4 Boulevard Royal 2449 Luxembourg / LU | [2010/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gambini, Giovanni Via A. Omodeo 7 56100, PISA / IT | [2010/31] | Representative(s) | Branca, Emanuela, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2011/19] |
Former [2011/10] | Coletti, Raimondo, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2010/31] | Branca, Emanuela, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10151667.2 | 26.01.2010 | [2010/31] | Priority number, date | IT2009MI00103 | 29.01.2009 Original published format: IT MI20090103 | [2010/31] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2213600 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2213600 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/22, B65H19/26, B65H19/28 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
B65H19/283 (EP,US);
B65H19/2269 (EP,US);
B65H19/267 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/31] | B65H19/22, B65H19/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | Rückwickeler und Verfahren zum Aufwickeln von Papier um einen Kern zur Herstellung von Rollen | [2010/31] | English: | Rewinder and method for winding paper around a core for making a log | [2010/31] | French: | Appareil de rembobinage amélioré et procédé correspondant pour enrouler du papier pour former un rouleau | [2010/31] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 18.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.01.2010 | AT | 19.09.2012 | BE | 19.09.2012 | CY | 19.09.2012 | CZ | 19.09.2012 | DK | 19.09.2012 | EE | 19.09.2012 | FI | 19.09.2012 | HR | 19.09.2012 | LT | 19.09.2012 | LV | 19.09.2012 | MK | 19.09.2012 | MT | 19.09.2012 | NL | 19.09.2012 | PL | 19.09.2012 | RO | 19.09.2012 | SE | 19.09.2012 | SI | 19.09.2012 | SK | 19.09.2012 | SM | 19.09.2012 | TR | 19.09.2012 | BG | 19.12.2012 | NO | 19.12.2012 | GR | 20.12.2012 | IS | 19.01.2013 | PT | 21.01.2013 | IE | 26.01.2013 | LU | 26.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MK | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
SM | 19.09.2012 | ||
TR | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 26.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
SM | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 26.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 26.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 26.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 19.09.2012 | |
NO | 19.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5690296 (BIAGIOTTI GUGLIELMO [IT]) [X] 1,2,4,5,12,13 * column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 13; figures 1-7 * [Y] 11; | [X]WO2007141818 (PERINI FABIO SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,11-13 * page 9, line 16 - page 12, line 10 * * page 13, line 16 - page 14, line 13 * * page 16 - pages 9-24; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0498039 (CONSANI ALBERTO SPA [IT]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0853060 (ITALCONVERTING SRL [IT]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [YDA]WO9421545 (PERINI FABIO SPA [IT], et al) [YD] 11 * the whole document * [A] 1-10,12-15 | by applicant | WO9421545 | EP1262434 |