EP2218500 - SUPERFICIALLY POROUS PARTICLES AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/33] | Superficially porous particles and methods of making and using same | ||
[2020/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | [2020/24] |
Former [2010/33] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Wu Agilent Technologis, Inc. 5301 Stevens Creek Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | 02 /
Wei, Ta-Chen Agilent Technologies, Inc. 5301 Stevens Creek Blvd Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [2020/24] |
Former [2010/33] | 01 /
Chen, Wu Agilent Technologis, Inc. 5301 Stevens Creek Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
02 /
Wei, Ta-Chen Agilent Technologies, Inc. 5301 Stevens Creek Blvd Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/24] |
Former [2010/33] | Barth, Daniel Mathias Agilent Technologies Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Herrenberger Strasse 130 71034 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10151960.1 | 28.01.2010 | [2010/33] | Priority number, date | US20090372240 | 17.02.2009 Original published format: US 372240 | [2010/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2218500 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2218500 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2218500 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/28, B01J20/282, B01J20/32, B01J2/00, B01J20/286 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
B01J20/3257 (EP,US);
B01J20/28004 (EP,US);
B01J20/28016 (EP,US);
B01J20/2803 (EP,US);
B01J20/28057 (EP,US);
B01J20/28078 (EP,US);
B01J20/286 (EP,US);
B01J20/3242 (EP,US);
B01J20/3268 (EP,US);
B01J20/3272 (EP,US);
B01J20/3293 (EP,US);
B01J20/3295 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/33] | B01J20/28, B01J20/282, B01J20/32, B01J2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] |
Former [2010/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHLICH PORÖSE PARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2020/04] | English: | SUPERFICIALLY POROUS PARTICLES AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME | [2020/04] | French: | PARTICULES À SURFACE POREUSE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2020/04] |
Former [2010/33] | Oberflächlich poröse Partikel und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und Verwendung | ||
Former [2010/33] | Superficially porous particles and methods of making and using same | ||
Former [2010/33] | Particules à surface poreuse et leurs procédés de fabrication et d'utilisation | Examination procedure | 03.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 24.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2010 | AT | 10.06.2020 | CY | 10.06.2020 | CZ | 10.06.2020 | DK | 10.06.2020 | EE | 10.06.2020 | ES | 10.06.2020 | FI | 10.06.2020 | HR | 10.06.2020 | IT | 10.06.2020 | LT | 10.06.2020 | LV | 10.06.2020 | MC | 10.06.2020 | MK | 10.06.2020 | MT | 10.06.2020 | NL | 10.06.2020 | PL | 10.06.2020 | RO | 10.06.2020 | SE | 10.06.2020 | SI | 10.06.2020 | SK | 10.06.2020 | SM | 10.06.2020 | TR | 10.06.2020 | BG | 10.09.2020 | NO | 10.09.2020 | GR | 11.09.2020 | IS | 10.10.2020 | PT | 12.10.2020 | IE | 28.01.2021 | LU | 28.01.2021 | BE | 31.01.2021 | CH | 31.01.2021 | FR | 31.01.2021 | LI | 31.01.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 28.01.2010 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
MK | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
TR | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
IE | 28.01.2021 | ||
LU | 28.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 28.01.2010 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
MK | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
IE | 28.01.2021 | ||
LU | 28.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 28.01.2010 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
IE | 28.01.2021 | ||
LU | 28.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
IE | 28.01.2021 | ||
LU | 28.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
IE | 28.01.2021 | ||
LU | 28.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
IE | 28.01.2021 | ||
LU | 28.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
LU | 28.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
LU | 28.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
LU | 28.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 10.06.2020 | |
NO | 10.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2008971 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 9-15 * column 3, line 37; figure 1 * * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 9 * * column 5, line 29 * * column 10, lines 24,26,29,32,49 * * column 7, lines 30,52 * * column 8, line 4 *; | [A]US5540834 (CARR PETER W [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 10 * * column 3, lines 20-25 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 4 * * column 6, line 45 - line 51 * * column 5, line 11 - line 14 *; | [A]US4560704 (REGNIER FREDERICK E [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 20 - line 30 * * column 7, lines 66-68 * * claim 5 * * column 5, line 30 - line 40 *; | [AD]US2007189944 (KIRKLAND JOSEPH J [US], et al) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document * | [I] - KIRKLAND J J ET AL, "Superficially porous silica microspheres for fast high-performance liquid chromatography of macromolecules", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, NL, (20000818), vol. 890, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0021-9673(00)00392-7, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 3 - 13, XP004228904 [I] 1-8 * page 4, column l - column r * * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, line 19 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(00)00392-7 | [A] - J.J. KIRKLAND; T.J. LANGLOIS; J.J. DESTEFANO, "Fused Core Particles for HPLC Columns", AMERICAN LABORATORY, (200704), vol. 39, no. 8, pages 18 - 21, XP002665205 [A] 9-15 * page 18 * | Examination | US4477492 |