EP2221754 - RFID tag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | For all designated states Fujitsu Frontech Limited 1776, Yanokuchi Inagi-shi Tokyo 206-8555 / JP | [2010/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baba, Shunji c/o FUJITSU Advanced Technologies Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Hashimoto, Shigeru c/o FUJITSU FRONTECH LIMITED 1776, Yanokuchi Inagi-shi Tokyo 206-8555 / JP | 03 /
Niwata, Tsuyoshi c/o FUJITSU FRONTECH LIMITED 1776, Yanokuchi Inagi-shi Tokyo 206-8555 / JP | [2010/34] | Representative(s) | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 10152276.1 | 01.02.2010 | [2010/34] | Priority number, date | JP20090040269 | 24.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009040269 | [2010/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2221754 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, G06K19/073, G09F3/03 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
G06K19/07372 (EP,US);
G06K19/07798 (EP,US);
G09F3/0323 (EP,US);
G09F3/0335 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1324 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RFID-Etikett | [2010/34] | English: | RFID tag | [2010/34] | French: | Étiquette RFID | [2010/34] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 17.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006074518 (HENDERSON MATTHEW [AU]) [A] 1-11 * page 9, line 16 - page 14, line 13; figures 1-10 *; | [A]WO2007121508 (RUGGIERO RICHARD [AU]) [A] 1-11* page 10, line 8 - page 13, line 16; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2008266108 (TEETER CHARLES MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2000048147 | JP3636202B | JP2005242971 |