Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020085856 | ![]() | 19.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514959574 | 04.12.2015 | US201414295950 | 04.06.2014 | US201615210226 | 14.07.2016 | US5572608 | 26.03.2008 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US201213647894 | 09.10.2012 | US201113015134 | 27.01.2011 | US201916693800 | 25.11.2019 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | US9620905 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016082039 | ![]() | 24.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514959574 | 04.12.2015 | US201414295950 | 04.06.2014 | US5572608 | 26.03.2008 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US201213647894 | 09.10.2012 | US201113015134 | 27.01.2011 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | US9620905 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014286891 | ![]() | 25.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414295950 | 04.06.2014 | US5572608 | 26.03.2008 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US201213647894 | 09.10.2012 | US201113015134 | 27.01.2011 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | US9620905 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8889115 | ![]() | 18.11.2014 | B2 | US2013272992 | 17.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5572608 | 26.03.2008 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US201213647894 | 09.10.2012 | US201113015134 | 27.01.2011 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | US9620905 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8778324 | ![]() | 15.07.2014 | B2 | US2013272991 | 17.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US201213647690 | 09.10.2012 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US5576508 | 26.03.2008 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | US9620905 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013272990 | ![]() | 17.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213646104 | 05.10.2012 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US5574608 | 26.03.2008 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | US9620905 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8475780 | ![]() | 02.07.2013 | B2 | US2011206631 | 25.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5572608 | 26.03.2008 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US201113015134 | 27.01.2011 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | US9620905 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8409561 | ![]() | 02.04.2013 | B2 | US2011033505 | 10.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9576005 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US85726410 | 16.08.2010 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8445014 | ![]() | 21.05.2013 | B2 | US2009148533 | 11.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23884408 | 26.09.2008 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US9591805 | 30.03.2005 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8147873 | ![]() | 03.04.2012 | B2 | US2008260679 | 23.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5545708 | 26.03.2008 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8282913 | ![]() | 09.10.2012 | B2 | US2008241093 | 02.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5574608 | 26.03.2008 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | US9620905 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8216560 | ![]() | 10.07.2012 | B2 | US2008241092 | 02.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5572608 | 26.03.2008 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | US9620905 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8287847 | ![]() | 16.10.2012 | B2 | US2008233073 | 25.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US5576508 | 26.03.2008 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | US9620905 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7429394 | ![]() | 30.09.2008 | B2 | US2006024336 | 02.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US9591805 | 30.03.2005 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7776319 | ![]() | 17.08.2010 | B2 | US2006024265 | 02.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9576005 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8192758 | ![]() | 05.06.2012 | B2 | US2005220890 | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8282960 | ![]() | 09.10.2012 | B2 | US2005220889 | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7556799 | ![]() | 07.07.2009 | B2 | US2005220752 | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | US9620905 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7854924 | ![]() | 21.12.2010 | B2 | US2005220750 | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10485821 | ![]() | 26.11.2019 | B2 | US2016317572 | 03.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514959574 | 04.12.2015 | US201414295950 | 04.06.2014 | US201615210226 | 14.07.2016 | US5572608 | 26.03.2008 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US201213647894 | 09.10.2012 | US201113015134 | 27.01.2011 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | US9620905 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20130086262 | ![]() | 31.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10978 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101399238B | ![]() | 27.05.2014 | B1 | KR20140003661 | 09.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10978 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101362509B | ![]() | 13.02.2014 | B1 | KR20120130255 | 29.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10978 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101269766B | ![]() | 30.05.2013 | B1 | KR20120060920 | 12.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10978 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101228233B | ![]() | 31.01.2013 | B1 | KR20060135044 | 28.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10978 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101223335B | ![]() | 17.01.2013 | B1 | KR20110138300 | 26.12.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10747 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101199608B | ![]() | 08.11.2012 | B1 | KR20060135045 | 28.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | WO2005US11010 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101153035B | ![]() | 11.06.2012 | B1 | KR20070007168 | 12.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10747 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4974882B | ![]() | 11.07.2012 | B2 | JP2007531774 | 08.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10978 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4964122B | ![]() | 27.06.2012 | B2 | JP2007531758 | 08.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10747 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5000480B | ![]() | 15.08.2012 | B2 | JP2007531726 | 08.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | WO2005US11010 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3574896 | ![]() | 04.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10978 | 30.03.2005 | EP05732849 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | EP10152337 | 30.03.2005 | EP10186221 | 30.03.2005 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | EP16203827 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3219312 | ![]() | 30.01.2019 | B1 | EP3219312 | 20.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10978 | 30.03.2005 | EP05732849 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | EP10152337 | 30.03.2005 | EP10186221 | 30.03.2005 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2269590 | ![]() | 05.10.2011 | A3 | EP2269590 | 05.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05732849 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | EP10152337 | 30.03.2005 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2269589 | ![]() | 25.12.2013 | B1 | EP2269589 | 05.10.2011 | A3 | EP2269589 | 05.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05732849 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | EP10152337 | 30.03.2005 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2158902 | ![]() | 06.12.2017 | B1 | EP2158902 | 03.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | EP05731099 | 30.03.2005 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1732524 | ![]() | 22.08.2012 | B1 | EP1732524 | 19.09.2007 | A4 | EP1732524 | 20.12.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | WO2005US11010 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1732523 | ![]() | 02.06.2010 | B9 | EP1732523 | 17.03.2010 | B1 | EP1732523 | 06.06.2007 | A4 | EP1732523 | 20.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10978 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1732516 | ![]() | 30.12.2009 | B1 | EP1732516 | 06.06.2007 | A4 | EP1732516 | 20.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10747 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2829943 | ![]() | 14.03.2017 | C | CA2829943 | 20.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2557848 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2806465 | ![]() | 24.05.2016 | C | CA2806465 | 20.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2558029 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018206706B | ![]() | 06.08.2020 | B2 | AU2018206706 | 02.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2016216697 | 19.08.2016 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | AU2010214729 | 30.08.2010 | AU2018206706 | 17.07.2018 | AU2012254879 | 14.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016216697C | ![]() | 21.03.2019 | C1 | AU2016216697B | 19.04.2018 | B2 | AU2016216697 | 08.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2016216697 | 19.08.2016 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | AU2010214729 | 30.08.2010 | AU2012254879 | 14.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012254879B | ![]() | 19.05.2016 | B2 | AU2012254879 | 13.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | AU2010214729 | 30.08.2010 | AU2012254879 | 14.11.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010214732B | ![]() | 12.07.2012 | B2 | AU2010214732 | 23.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10747 | 30.03.2005 | AU2005231383 | 30.03.2005 | AU2010214732 | 30.08.2010 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010214729B | ![]() | 16.08.2012 | B2 | AU2010214729 | 23.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10978 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | AU2005231424 | 30.03.2005 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | AU2010214729 | 30.08.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005231424B | ![]() | 17.06.2010 | B2 | AU2005231424 | 20.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10978 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005231383B | ![]() | 10.06.2010 | B2 | AU2005231383 | 20.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10747 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005228696B | ![]() | 24.06.2010 | B2 | AU2005228696 | 13.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | WO2005US11010 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2184059 | ![]() | 27.06.2012 | B1 | EP2184059 | 19.05.2010 | A3 | EP2184059 | 12.05.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05732849 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE453383T | 15.01.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10747 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE460927T | 15.04.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10978 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0509331 | 25.05.2021 | B8 | BRPI0509331 | 27.11.2018 | B1 | BRPI0509331 | 04.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | WO2005US11010 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0509365 | 25.05.2021 | B8 | BRPI0509365 | 12.06.2018 | B1 | BRPI0509365 | 04.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10747 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0509366 | 25.05.2021 | B8 | BRPI0509366 | 24.07.2018 | B1 | BRPI0509366 | 04.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10978 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2557848 | 10.12.2013 | C | CA2557848 | 20.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10747 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2557999 | 12.11.2013 | C | CA2557999 | 13.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | WO2005US11010 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2558029 | 07.05.2013 | C | CA2558029 | 20.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10978 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101001614B | 03.07.2013 | B | CN101001614 | 18.07.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10978 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103251571B | 17.08.2016 | B | CN103251571 | 21.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | CN200580010526 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1980639B | 04.05.2011 | B | CN1980639 | 13.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10747 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1980645 | 13.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE112005000708 | 21.12.2017 | B4 | DE112005000708T | 15.02.2007 | T5 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10747 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE112005000725 | 21.12.2017 | B4 | DE112005000725T | 03.05.2007 | T5 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | WO2005US11010 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE112005000730 | 21.12.2017 | B4 | DE112005000730T | 03.07.2008 | T5 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10978 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005018619D1 | 11.02.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10747 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005019992D1 | 29.04.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10978 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2269589T | 31.03.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | EP10152337 | 30.03.2005 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3219312T | 01.04.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | EP10186221 | 30.03.2005 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2430624 | 05.08.2009 | B | GB2430624 | 04.04.2007 | A | GB0621241D0 | 13.12.2006 | D0 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10747 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2430367 | 05.08.2009 | B | GB2430367 | 28.03.2007 | A | GB0621242D0 | 13.12.2006 | D0 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10978 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2430368 | 26.08.2009 | B | GB2430368 | 28.03.2007 | A | GB0621244D0 | 13.12.2006 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | WO2005US11010 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2456253 | 26.08.2009 | B | GB2456253 | 15.07.2009 | A | GB0906966D0 | 03.06.2009 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | GB0621242 | 30.03.2005 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | GB0906966 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2456256 | 26.08.2009 | B | GB2456256 | 15.07.2009 | A | GB0907161D0 | 10.06.2009 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | GB0621241 | 30.03.2005 | GB0907161 | 30.03.2005 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1106133 | 07.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10747 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1109338 | 06.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10978 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA06011270 | 08.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10747 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1732523T | 31.08.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10978 | 30.03.2005 | EP05732849 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2184059T | 31.01.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP05732849 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | EP10152337 | 30.03.2005 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2269589T | 30.05.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP05732849 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | EP10152337 | 30.03.2005 | EP10186212 | 30.03.2005 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3219312T | 31.07.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10978 | 30.03.2005 | EP05732849 | 30.03.2005 | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | EP10152337 | 30.03.2005 | EP10186221 | 30.03.2005 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | EP16203827 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005097081 | ![]() | 20.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005097072 | ![]() | 20.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005094384 | ![]() | 26.01.2006 | A3 | WO2005094384 | 13.10.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7488495 | ![]() | 10.02.2009 | B2 | US2005220751 | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014040484 | ![]() | 06.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5671511B | ![]() | 18.02.2015 | B2 | JP2013056909 | 28.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5431439B | ![]() | 05.03.2014 | B2 | JP2012031210 | 16.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5600658B | ![]() | 01.10.2014 | B2 | JP2012025783 | 09.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102133196B | 21.01.2015 | B | CN102133196 | 27.07.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2338667T | 11.05.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2339571T | 21.05.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2388052T | 08.10.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2453048T | 03.04.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2659386T | 15.03.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2720612T | 23.07.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2184059E | 06.07.2012 | E | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2269589E | 26.02.2014 | E | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3219312T | 01.03.2019 | T | Priority number | Date | US81474904 | 30.03.2004 | US81387204 | 30.03.2004 | US96527404 | 13.10.2004 | US81452704 | 30.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | EP2269589 | EP2269590 | EP3219312 | Type | ![]() | EP1732523 |