EP2187645 - Adaptive bit-precision entropy coding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/20] | Method and apparatus for coding and decoding using bit-precision | ||
[2010/42] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.05.2017 | ||
Former | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Humax Co., Ltd. (Yubang-dong), 2, Yeongmun-ro Cheoin-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 449-934 / KR | [2016/20] |
Former [2014/40] | For all designated states Humax Holdings Co., Ltd. (Yubang-dong) 2, Yeongmun-ro Cheoin-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 449-934 / KR | ||
Former [2010/20] | For all designated states Humax Co., Ltd. Humax Village 11-4 Sunae-dong, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 463-825 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jang, Euee-Seon 512, Sanhak Building., Hanyang University, Haengdang 1-dong, Seongdong-gu 133-791, Seoul / KR | 02 /
Lee, Sun-Young 512, Sanhak Building., Hanyang University, Haengdang 1-dong, Seongdong-gu 133-791, Seoul / KR | 03 /
Son, Gi-Seok 2-301, Miseong Apt., Wolgye 3-dong, Nowon-gu 139-053, Seoul / KR | 04 /
Lee, Chung-Ku 16-406, Dongah Apt., Bupyeong 1-dong, Bupyeong-gu 403-011, Incheon / KR | [2010/20] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10152392.6 | 18.07.2008 | [2010/20] | Priority number, date | KR20070071779 | 18.07.2007 Original published format: KR 20070071779 | KR20080015213 | 20.02.2008 Original published format: KR 20080015213 | KR20080024643 | 17.03.2008 Original published format: KR 20080024643 | KR20080037856 | 23.04.2008 Original published format: KR 20080037856 | [2010/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2187645 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2187645 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N7/50, H03M7/30 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
H04N19/517 (EP,US);
H04N19/102 (EP,US);
H04N19/13 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/182 (EP,US);
H04N19/184 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/20] | H04N7/26, H04N7/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Entropiekodierung mit adaptiver Bitgenauigkeit | [2010/42] | English: | Adaptive bit-precision entropy coding | [2010/42] | French: | Codage entropique avec adaptation de la précision binaire | [2010/42] |
Former [2010/20] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kodierung und Dekodierung mit Bit-Präzision | ||
Former [2010/20] | Method and apparatus for coding and decoding using bit-precision | ||
Former [2010/20] | Procédé et appareil permettant le codage et de décodage au moyen de la précision binaire | Examination procedure | 24.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 30.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/24] | 10.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/39] | 12.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/39] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08778887.3 / EP2172028 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080778887) is 30.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007092150 (CHIBA TAKUMA [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * figure 3 * * figure 8 * * figure 10 * * figure 19 *; | [X]WO03005626 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10-12,14 * figure 1 *; | [X]WO9956472 (ROCKWELL SCIENCE CENTER LLC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10-12,14 * figure 1 * * figures 2a-2c * * figure 3 *; | [XP]WO2008060040 (HUMAX CO LTD [KR], et al) [XP] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10-12,14 * figure 1 * * figure 2 * * figure 5 * * figure 9 *; | [A]KR100636370B (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * figure 7 * * figure 9 *; | [A]WO0049571 (DIGITAL ACCELERATOR CORP [CA], et al) [A] 1-14 * figure 25 *; | [A]WO9222166 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * figure 1 *; | [A] - WIEN, "16 bit Adaptive Block size Transforms", 3. JVT MEETING; 60. MPEG MEETING; 06-05-2002 - 10-05-2002; FAIRFAX,US; (JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20020510), no. JVT-C107r1-L, ISSN 0000-0442, XP030005217 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - JONGWOO WON ET AL, Bit-Precision Method for Low Complex Lossless Image Coding, ADVANCES IN INTELLIGENT COMPUTING : INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT COMPUTING, ICIC 2005, HEFEI, CHINA, AUGUST 23 - 26, 2005; PROCEEDINGS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, PAGE(S) 155 - 164, (20050101), ISBN 978-3-540-28226-6, XP019016953 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - MARPE D ET AL, "Context-based adaptive binary arithmetic coding in the H.264/AVC video compression standard", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20030701), vol. 13, no. 7, doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2003.815173, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 620 - 636, XP011099255 [A] 3,6,9,13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2003.815173 | [A] - KICKEN P H M, "IMPLEMENTING THE ADRC ALGORITHM WITHIN AN MPEG-2 VIDEO DECODER", INTERNET CITATION, (19970505), pages I - III, URL: http://alexandria.tue.nl/extra1/afstversl/E/497859.pdf, (20110429), XP002634865 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |