EP2213919 - Valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonanno, Rosario Ahornstrasse 11 65812 Bad Soden / DE | [2010/31] | Application number, filing date | 10152500.4 | 03.02.2010 | [2010/31] | Priority number, date | DE20091007317 | 03.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009007317 | [2010/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2213919 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/00 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
F16K31/004 (EP);
F16K31/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ventil | [2010/31] | English: | Valve | [2010/31] | French: | Soupape | [2010/31] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/34] | 17.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS62177383 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [X] 1-16 * abstract *; | [X]JPS62224780 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [X] 1-16 * abstract *; | [X]JPH07158757 (NIPPON DENSO CO) [X] 1-16 * abstract *; | [X]EP1510741 (SMC KK [JP]) [X] 1-16 * figures 2,3,8,9 *; | [X]US4545561 (BROWN HENRY C [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract *; | [X]EP1357321 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * |