blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2353387

EP2353387 - Use of succinate dehydrogenase (SDH) inhibitors in the treatment of plant types in the sweet grass family [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  27.01.2012
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.01.2012Refusal of applicationpublished on 29.02.2012  [2012/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer CropScience AG
Gebäude 6100
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50
40789 Monheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/32]For all designated states
Bayer CropScience AG
Gebäude 6100 Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50
40789 Monheim / DE
Application number, filing date10152790.105.02.2010
[2011/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2353387
Date:10.08.2011
Language:DE
[2011/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2010
ClassificationIPC:A01N43/40, A01N43/56, A01N45/02, A01N61/00, A01P21/00, // A01N43/653, A01N43/30, A01N43/88
[2011/32]
CPC:
A01N43/56 (EP,US); A01N43/30 (EP,US); A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N43/653 (EP,US); A01N43/88 (EP,US); A01N61/00 (EP,US);
Y02A40/146 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
A01N43/30, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/30, A01N43/653 (EP,US);
A01N43/56, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/56, A01N43/653 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/32]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Succinat-Dehydrogenase (SDH)-Inhibitoren in der Behandlung von Pflanzenarten der Familie der Süssgräser[2011/32]
English:Use of succinate dehydrogenase (SDH) inhibitors in the treatment of plant types in the sweet grass family[2011/32]
French:Utilisation d'inhibiteurs de succinate déshydrogénase (SDH) dans le traitement de types de plantes de la famille des graminées[2011/32]
Examination procedure19.09.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2012/09]
29.09.2011Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/09]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2005018324  (BASF AG [DE], et al);
 [A]WO2006089876  (BASF AG [DE], et al);
 [Y]WO2007090788  (BASF AG [DE], et al);
 [X]EP2039771  (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]);
 [XY]WO2009098218  (BASF SE [DE], et al);
 [A]WO2009098223  (BASF SE [DE], et al);
by applicantWO8910396
 WO9102069
 WO9205251
 WO9509910
 EP0737682
 DE19531813
 WO9827806
 US6229072
 WO0164928
 WO03010149
 WO03070705
 WO03074491
 WO03096797
 EP1389614
 WO2004035589
 WO2005002324
 WO2006013010
 WO2006015865
 WO2006015866
 WO2006021972
 WO2006087343
 WO2006131221
 WO2008142163
 WO2009106633
 WO2010000612
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.