EP2249219 - Method for selecting a communication system allocated to a transfer network of an automation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/45] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eichner, Ingo Löblerinweg 37 91413, Neustadt/Aisch / DE | 02 /
Munoz Ibarra, Pablo Märterleinsweg 16 91058, Erlangen / DE | 03 /
Wedel, Friedrich Ibergstrasse 68a 8405 Winterthur / CH | [2010/45] | Application number, filing date | 10152864.4 | 08.02.2010 | [2010/45] | Priority number, date | DE20091012164 | 06.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009012164 | [2010/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2249219 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2249219 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/05, G06F3/00, G05B19/418, G06F3/048 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
G05B19/41855 (EP,US);
G05B19/05 (US);
G06F3/00 (US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/45] | G05B19/05 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] |
Former [2010/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Auswahl eines einem Übertragungsnetz eines Automatisierungs-Systems zugeordneten Kommunikationssystems | [2010/45] | English: | Method for selecting a communication system allocated to a transfer network of an automation system | [2010/45] | French: | Procédé de sélection d'un système de communication agencé dans un réseau de transmission d'un système d'automatisation | [2010/45] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2010 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 08.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/04] | 22.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2020 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003035005 (KODOSKY JEFFREY L [US], et al) [X] 1-8* the whole document * | Examination | US7315985 | by applicant | - BUCH; HANS BERGER, AUTOMATING WITH SIMATIC, PUBLICIS CORPORATE PUBLITION, (10620) |