EP2218864 - Intake guide for a mounting in a roller blind box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states profine GmbH Mülheimer Straße 26 53840 Troisdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/33] | For all designated states profine GmbH Mülheimer Strasse 26 53840 Troisdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leonzi, Bruno Christoph-Eichenlaub Straße 13 76275, Ettlingen / DE | 02 /
Würtz, Hans Merkurstraße 13 66954, Pirmasens / DE | [2010/33] | Representative(s) | profine Patent Zweibrücker Straße 200 66954 Pirmasens / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/33] | Wübken, Ludger profine GmbH Patentabteilung Geb. 56 Mülheimer Strasse 26 53840 Troisdorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 10152867.7 | 08.02.2010 | [2010/33] | Priority number, date | DE20091000700 | 06.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009000700 | [2010/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2218864 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2218864 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/17 | [2010/33] | CPC: |
E06B9/17007 (EP);
E06B9/17061 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/33] | Extension states | BA | 19.09.2014 | RS | 19.09.2014 | Title | German: | Einlauftrichter für ein Mittellager eines Rollladenkastens | [2010/33] | English: | Intake guide for a mounting in a roller blind box | [2010/33] | French: | Pavillon d'introduction pour un palier intermédiaire d'un coffre de store | [2010/33] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 10.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/06] | 27.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002061475 (HASEGAWA SHUTTER KOGYO KK) [A] 1-5 * figure 8 *; | [A]FR2905722 (SOPROFEN SOC PAR ACTIONS SIMPL [FR]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2524736 (NAGELSCHMIDT WILLI) [A] 1-5 * page 12, lines 16-19; figure 5 *; | [A]DE8914394U (KARL ACHENBACH GMBH) [A] 1-5 * figures 1,6,7 * |