Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7944629 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2011 | B2 | US2010208369 | 19.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20090012374 | 16.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101058679B | Global Dossier | 22.08.2011 | B1 | KR20100093263 | 25.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20090012374 | 16.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2219365 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2016 | B1 | EP2219365 | 25.04.2012 | A3 | EP2219365 | 18.08.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20090012374 | 16.02.2009 |