Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] |
22.08.2016 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.03.2016 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
12.02.2016 | Change - German title | published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
06.10.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.08.2015 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
26.05.2015 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
05.04.2015 | Change - classification | published on 06.05.2015 [2015/19] |
05.04.2015 | Change - classification | published on 06.05.2015 [2015/19] |
11.10.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.10.2013 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
10.10.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.07.2013 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
05.07.2013 | First examination report | |
10.10.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.12.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant | |
09.09.2011 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] |
25.02.2011 | Publication of search report | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] |
03.01.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.10.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] |
18.02.2010 | Change: Renewal fee paid | |
18.02.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |