EP2196394 - Method for collecting and treating waste water from engine washing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/24] | Method and apparatus for collecting and treating waste water from engine washing | ||
[2012/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pratt & Whitney Line Maintenance Services, Inc. 411 Silver Lane East Hartford, Connecticut 06118 / US | [2012/49] |
Former [2010/24] | For all designated states Gas Turbine Efficiency AB P.O. Box 633 175 27 Järfälla / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hjerpe, Carl-Johan Sigunvägen 4 131 46 Nacka / SE | 02 /
Asplund, Peter Berghamnsvägen 61 165 71 Hässelby / SE | [2012/49] |
Former [2010/24] | 01 /
Hjerpe, Carl-Johan Sigunvägen 4 131 46 Nacka / SE | ||
02 /
Asplund, Peter Berghamnsvägen 61 165 71 Hässelby / SE | Representative(s) | Lindgren, Anders BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | [2012/49] |
Former [N/P] | Lindgren, Anders BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2010/24] | Lindgren, Anders Brann AB P O Box 17192 104 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 10153454.3 | 14.06.2004 | [2010/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2196394 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2196394 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | [2010/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2196394 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B64F5/00, F01D25/00 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
F01D25/002 (EP,US);
B08B3/02 (EP,KR,US);
B05B7/0093 (US);
B05B7/166 (US);
B05B7/26 (US);
B08B3/003 (US);
B08B3/026 (US);
B08B3/08 (KR,US);
B08B3/10 (US);
B08B9/00 (EP,US);
B08B9/093 (US);
B60S3/044 (US);
B64F5/00 (KR);
E03B1/042 (US);
F02C7/00 (KR);
F05D2220/323 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Sammeln und Behandeln von Abwasser von einer Motorwäsche | [2012/26] | English: | Method for collecting and treating waste water from engine washing | [2012/26] | French: | Procédé pour la collecte et le traitement d'eaux usées du lavage d'un moteur | [2012/26] |
Former [2010/24] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Sammeln und Behandeln von Abwasser von einer Motorwäsche | ||
Former [2010/24] | Method and apparatus for collecting and treating waste water from engine washing | ||
Former [2010/24] | Procédé et appareil pour la collecte et le traitement d'eaux usées du lavage d'un moteur | Examination procedure | 17.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 03.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.06.2012 | 13.06.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04736825.3 / EP1756399 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040736825) is 03.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2004 | AT | 05.12.2012 | CY | 05.12.2012 | CZ | 05.12.2012 | EE | 05.12.2012 | FI | 05.12.2012 | IT | 05.12.2012 | MC | 05.12.2012 | PL | 05.12.2012 | RO | 05.12.2012 | SI | 05.12.2012 | SK | 05.12.2012 | TR | 05.12.2012 | BG | 05.03.2013 | GR | 06.03.2013 | ES | 16.03.2013 | PT | 05.04.2013 | IE | 14.06.2013 | LU | 14.06.2013 | FR | 01.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
IE | 14.06.2013 | ||
FR | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
IE | 14.06.2013 | ||
FR | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
IE | 14.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
ES | 16.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH341262 (SVENSKA TURBINFAB AB [SE]) [Y] 16,18 * page 1, lines 15-21; figure - *; | [A]US4234323 (MAHER JOHN F) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]DE9420362U (HANRATH JOACHIM [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [XDY]US5899217 (TESTMAN JR FRANK L [US]) [XD] 1,6,10,11 * page 4, lines 39-44,49-50 * * page 5, lines 1-6,45-53,59-65 * * page 9, lines 10-24 * * page 10, lines 2-6; figure - * [Y] 16,18; | [X]US2003209256 (TADAYON SHAHIN [US]) [X] 1,4,7 * paragraphs [0002] , [0021] , [0029] , [0035] , [0037] , [0040]; figure - * | by applicant | US4642192 | US5899217 |