EP2202112 - Vehicle mounted electrical generator system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contour Hardening, Inc. 8401 Northwest Boulevard Indianapolis, Indiana 46278 / US | [2010/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Storm, John M 1241 North County Road West Danville, IN 46122 / US | 02 /
Pugh, Nathan D 1907 Dutch Elm Drive Indianapolis, IN 46231 / US | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Williams, Michael Ian Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Williams, Michael Ian Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10153731.4 | 22.02.2005 | [2010/26] | Priority number, date | US20040783266 | 20.02.2004 Original published format: US 783266 | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2202112 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2202112 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/12, // B60W30/18, B60W10/06, B60W30/184 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
B60K25/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W2710/0627 (EP,US);
B60W2710/0644 (EP,US);
B60W30/18054 (EP,US);
B60W30/184 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/26] | B60L11/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/31] |
Former [2010/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugmontiertes elektrisches Generatorsystem | [2010/26] | English: | Vehicle mounted electrical generator system | [2010/26] | French: | Système générateur électrique monté sur un véhicule | [2010/26] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2010 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 28.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/01] | 10.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2019/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05714033.7 / EP1718492 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050714033) is 10.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4357565 (SAITO SHIGEKI, et al) [A] 13 * column 2, line 3 - column 5, line 15 * * the whole document *; | [Y]US4573366 (KENNARD REED H [US]) [Y] 12,13 * column 4, lines 9-29; figures 3, 9 *; | [Y]JPH0454838 (TOYO KOUKI KK) [Y] 14,15* paragraph [0001] *; | [Y]US5287939 (FERNANDEZ RICKEY J [US]) [Y] 12,13 * column 1, line 11 - page 4, line 51; figure 1 * * the whole document *; | [A]EP0587352 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 13 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 55 * * the whole document *; | [A]US5314038 (PETERSON JR RUDOLPH A [US]) [A] 10-13 * column 1, line 21 - column 2, line 37; figure 1 *; | [XY]US5563451 (FURUKAWA KAZUTOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-9 * column 1, line 38 - column 3, line 5; figures 1, 2 * * the whole document * [Y] 4,10-15; | [Y]WO9944854 (CUMMINS ENGINE CO INC [US]) [Y] 4,10-15 * page 8 - page 13, line 7; figure 1 * * the whole document * | by applicant | US6157175 |