Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7057303 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2006 | B2 | US2006049638 | 09.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78326604 | 20.02.2004 | US26268405 | 31.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2923879 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2016 | A3 | EP2923879 | 30.09.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US78326604 | 20.02.2004 | EP05714033 | 22.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1718492 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2015 | B1 | EP1718492 | 10.09.2008 | A4 | EP1718492 | 08.11.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US05923 | 22.02.2005 | US78326604 | 20.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005216242C | Global Dossier | 31.07.2008 | C1 | AU2005216242B | 18.10.2007 | B2 | AU2005216242 | 09.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US05923 | 22.02.2005 | US78326604 | 20.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2202112 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2017 | A3 | EP2202112 | 30.06.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US78326604 | 20.02.2004 | EP05714033 | 22.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AP2225 | 28.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US05923 | 22.02.2005 | US78326604 | 20.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0507778 | 17.07.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US05923 | 22.02.2005 | US78326604 | 20.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2556495 | 29.03.2011 | C | CA2556495 | 09.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US05923 | 22.02.2005 | US78326604 | 20.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200607200 | 30.04.2008 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2005US05923 | 22.02.2005 | US78326604 | 20.02.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005082014 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2006 | A3 | WO2005082014 | 09.09.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US78326604 | 20.02.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6979913 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2005 | B2 | US2005184528 | 25.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78326604 | 20.02.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CR8564 | 26.04.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US78326604 | 20.02.2004 | Type | Earlier application | EP1718492 |