EP2243404 - Electronic mailbox system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hammoud, Hassan 3379 Randolph Street Windsor ON N9E 3E8 / CA | [2010/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | Targett, Kenneth Stanley Ken Targett 48 Meadowsweet Way Horton Heath Hampshire SO50 7PD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | Targett, Kenneth Stanley Ken Targett 48 Meadowsweet Way Horton Heath Hampshire SO50 7PD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10153778.5 | 17.02.2010 | [2010/43] | Priority number, date | US20090167102P | 06.04.2009 Original published format: US 167102 P | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2243404 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A47G29/12, A47G29/14 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
A47G29/1214 (EP,US);
A47G29/141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektronisches Mailboxsystem | [2010/43] | English: | Electronic mailbox system | [2010/43] | French: | Système de boîte de courrier électronique | [2010/43] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/44] | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2005253715 (AWOBUE CHRISTOPHER [US]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * figure - * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] * [Y] 4-8,14,15 [I] 11-13; | [Y]US5917411 (BAGGARLY JAMES H [US]) [Y] 4-8,14,15 * column 6, line 52 - line 65 * * column 3, line 10 - line 17 * * column 1, line 54 - line 56 * * column 2, line 11 - line 19 * * column 2, line 30 - line 37 *; | [Y]WO9741542 (PORTER DAVID [US]) [Y] 4-7 * page 4, line 3 - line 5 * * page 8, line 11 - line 19 * * page 10, line 15 - line 17 * * page 12, line 19 - line 23 * * page 13, line 10 - line 18 *; | [I]US4101877 (RUSH DONALD W) [I] 1 * column 1, line 32 - line 36 * * column 1, line 48 - line 51 * * column 2, line 25 - line 32 * * column 2, line 43 - line 47 * * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 7 * * figure - * | by applicant | US6107934 |