EP2194260 - Electromagnetic fuel injector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayatani, Masahiko c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Building Marunouchi 1 -chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Ishikawa, Tohru c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Building Marunouchi 1 -chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Abe, Motoyuki c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Building Marunouchi 1 -chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Sekine, Atsushi c/o Hitachi Car Engineering Co., Ltd. 2477 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki-ken 312-0062 / JP | [2011/51] |
Former [2010/23] | 01 /
Hayatani, Masahiko c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Building Marunouchi 1 -chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | ||
02 /
Ishikawa, Tohru c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Building Marunouchi 1 -chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
03 /
Abe, Motoyuki c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Building Marunouchi 1 -chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
04 /
Sekine, Atsushi c/o Hitachi Car Engineering Co., Ltd. 2477 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki-ken 312-0062 / JP | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/23] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10153898.1 | 19.01.2007 | [2010/23] | Priority number, date | JP20060040930 | 17.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006040930 | [2010/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2194260 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2194260 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F02M51/06, F02M61/10 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
F02M51/0685 (EP,US);
F02M2200/306 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2010/23] | Title | German: | Elektromagnetische Einspritzdüse und Montageverfahren dafür | [2010/23] | English: | Electromagnetic fuel injector | [2010/23] | French: | Injecteur de carburant électromagnétique et son procédé d'assemblage | [2010/23] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 13.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 03.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07001204.2 / EP1820959 | EP09170341.3 / EP2136068 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070001204) is 25.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 03.03.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 03.03.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.03.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19849210 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1,2,8,9 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 42; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE19756103 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1,2,8,9 * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 54; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1199465 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,8,9 * column 4, paragraph 0015 - column 5, paragraph 0021; figure 1 *; | [Y]JPH10339240 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1199465 | DE19849210 | DE19756103 |