EP2236061 - Automatic beverage dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2010/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haslacher, Christian / Schoosleitnerstrasse 13 5303, Thalgau / AT | 02 /
Huber, Michael / Oberndorf 18B 6341, Ebbs / AT | 03 /
Magg, Johann / Irsinger Str. 15 83368, St. Georgen / DE | [2011/49] |
Former [2010/40] | 01 /
Haslacher, Christian Schoosleitnerstrasse 13 5303, Thalgau / AT | ||
02 /
Huber, Michael Oberndorf 18B 6341, Ebbs / AT | |||
03 /
Magg, Johann Irsinger Str. 15 83368, St. Georgen / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/49] | Application number, filing date | 10153969.0 | 18.02.2010 | [2010/40] | Priority number, date | DE20091001752 | 23.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009001752 | [2010/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2236061 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2236061 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/44 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
A47J31/4485 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/40] | Title | German: | Getränkeautomat | [2010/40] | English: | Automatic beverage dispenser | [2010/40] | French: | Automate à boissons | [2010/40] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 22.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.02.2010 | CY | 07.12.2011 | CZ | 07.12.2011 | DK | 07.12.2011 | EE | 07.12.2011 | FI | 07.12.2011 | HR | 07.12.2011 | IE | 07.12.2011 | LT | 07.12.2011 | LV | 07.12.2011 | MK | 07.12.2011 | MT | 07.12.2011 | NL | 07.12.2011 | PL | 07.12.2011 | RO | 07.12.2011 | SE | 07.12.2011 | SI | 07.12.2011 | SK | 07.12.2011 | SM | 07.12.2011 | TR | 07.12.2011 | LU | 18.02.2012 | BE | 28.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | BG | 07.03.2012 | NO | 07.03.2012 | GR | 08.03.2012 | ES | 18.03.2012 | IS | 07.04.2012 | PT | 09.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MK | 07.12.2011 | ||
MT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
SM | 07.12.2011 | ||
TR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LU | 18.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MK | 07.12.2011 | ||
MT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
TR | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MK | 07.12.2011 | ||
MT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MK | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MK | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MK | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 07.12.2011 | |
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 07.12.2011 | |
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 07.12.2011 | |
NO | 07.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3902281 (COFFEE TEAM KAFFEEMASCHINEN GMBH) [A] 1,2,4,5,9 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE202006014354U (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document * |