EP2220987 - Spray extraction nozzle for cleaning a surface, in particular decontaminating the surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kärcher Futuretech GmbH Alfred-Schefenacker-Strasse 1 71409 Schwaikheim / DE | [2011/44] |
Former [2010/34] | For all designated states Kärcher Futuretech GmbH Max-Eyth-Strasse 35 71364 Winnenden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kostron, Markus / Albstrasse 14 71686 Remseck / DE | 02 /
Schweizer, Stefan / Zwischenäckerle 67 71522 Backnang / DE | [2012/34] |
Former [2010/34] | 01 /
Kostron, Markus Albstrasse 14 71686 Remseck / DE | ||
02 /
Schweizer, Stefan Zwischenäckerle 67 71522 Backnang / DE | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2010/34] | Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 10154058.1 | 19.02.2010 | [2010/34] | Priority number, date | DE20091011433 | 20.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009011433 | [2010/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2220987 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2220987 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/02, A47L11/20 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
A47L11/34 (EP);
A47L11/4044 (EP);
A47L11/4077 (EP);
A47L11/4088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/34] | Title | German: | Sprühextraktionsdüse zum Reinigen einer Oberfläche, insbesondere zum Dekontaminieren der Oberfläche | [2010/34] | English: | Spray extraction nozzle for cleaning a surface, in particular decontaminating the surface | [2010/34] | French: | Buse d'extraction par vaporisation destinée au nettoyage d'une surface, notamment à la décontamination de la surface | [2010/34] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 17.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.02.2010 | CY | 22.08.2012 | CZ | 22.08.2012 | DK | 22.08.2012 | EE | 22.08.2012 | FI | 22.08.2012 | HR | 22.08.2012 | LT | 22.08.2012 | LV | 22.08.2012 | MK | 22.08.2012 | MT | 22.08.2012 | PL | 22.08.2012 | RO | 22.08.2012 | SE | 22.08.2012 | SI | 22.08.2012 | SK | 22.08.2012 | SM | 22.08.2012 | BG | 22.11.2012 | NO | 22.11.2012 | GR | 23.11.2012 | ES | 03.12.2012 | IS | 22.12.2012 | PT | 24.12.2012 | IE | 19.02.2013 | LU | 19.02.2013 | BE | 28.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MK | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
SM | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
IE | 19.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
SM | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
IE | 19.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
IE | 19.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
IE | 19.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 22.08.2012 | |
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 22.08.2012 | |
NO | 22.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US4107816 (MATTHEWS PAUL WILLIAM) [X] 1,4,6-9 * column 2, lines 16-28 * [A] 2,3,10-12 [Y] 5; | [Y]EP1027858 (ALTO DANMARK A S [DK]) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0012] *; | [A]US5970574 (THRASH JR THOMAS B [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]WO0209570 (BURNS GEORGE M [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4119812 | DE102006033514 | WO9406344 | EP0316848 | DE2615501 |