EP2221417 - Jacking system for a leg of a jack-up platform [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GustoMSC Resources B.V. Karel Doormanweg 25 3115 JD Schiedam / NL | [2013/08] |
Former [2012/04] | For all designated states GustoMSC Resources B.V. Karel Doormanweg 66 3115 JD Schiedam / NL | ||
Former [2010/34] | For all designated states Marine Structure Consultants (MSC) B.V. Karel Doormanweg 66 3115 JD Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mikx, Johannes Wilhelmus Jacobus Voorstraat 450 3311 CX, Dordrecht / NL | [2013/39] |
Former [2010/34] | 01 /
Mikx, Johannes Wilhelmus Jacobus Voorstraat 450 3311 CX, Dordrecht / NL | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [2013/39] |
Former [2010/34] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 10154176.1 | 19.02.2010 | [2010/34] | Priority number, date | NL20092002549 | 20.02.2009 Original published format: NL 2002549 | [2010/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2221417 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2221417 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E02B17/08 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
E02B17/0872 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/34] | Title | German: | Hebesystem für den Schenkel einer Hebeplattform | [2010/34] | English: | Jacking system for a leg of a jack-up platform | [2010/34] | French: | Système de support pour pied d'une plateforme auto-élévatrice | [2010/34] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 25.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13168260.1 / EP2628854 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.02.2010 | AT | 25.09.2013 | BE | 25.09.2013 | BG | 25.09.2013 | CY | 25.09.2013 | CZ | 25.09.2013 | EE | 25.09.2013 | ES | 25.09.2013 | FI | 25.09.2013 | HR | 25.09.2013 | IT | 25.09.2013 | LT | 25.09.2013 | LV | 25.09.2013 | MC | 25.09.2013 | MK | 25.09.2013 | MT | 25.09.2013 | RO | 25.09.2013 | SE | 25.09.2013 | SI | 25.09.2013 | SK | 25.09.2013 | SM | 25.09.2013 | TR | 25.09.2013 | NO | 25.12.2013 | GR | 26.12.2013 | IS | 25.01.2014 | PT | 27.01.2014 | IE | 19.02.2014 | LU | 19.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 19.02.2010 | |
AT | 25.09.2013 | ||
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
BG | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
MT | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
SM | 25.09.2013 | ||
TR | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
IE | 19.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 19.02.2010 | |
AT | 25.09.2013 | ||
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
BG | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
MT | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
SM | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
IE | 19.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
BG | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
MT | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
SM | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
IE | 19.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
MT | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
SM | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
IE | 19.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
MT | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
IE | 19.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
IE | 19.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
LU | 19.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
LU | 19.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | BE | 25.09.2013 | |
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 25.09.2013 | |
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 25.09.2013 | |
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 25.09.2013 | |
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 25.09.2013 | |
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 25.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB838627 (DELONG CORP) [X] 1,8,10* page 15, line 89 - page 16, line 5; figures 16,17 *; | [XI]WO2009017399 (GUSTO B V [NL], et al) [X] 1-8,10 * page 7, line 13 - page 12, line 14; figures 1-3 * [I] 9 | by applicant | WO2009017399 |