EP2302703 - Method for manufacturing semiconductor light-emitting device and semiconductor light emitting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugizaki, Yoshiaki c/o Intellectual Property Division, Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kojima, Akihiro c/o Intellectual Property Division, Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ando, Masanobu c/o Intellectual Property Division, Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Furukawa, Kazuyoshi c/o Intellectual Property Division, Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/13] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10154638.0 | 25.02.2010 | [2011/13] | Priority number, date | JP20090220435 | 25.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009220435 | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2302703 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2302703 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00, H01L33/62, // H01L33/38 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
H01L33/62 (EP,US);
H01L33/0093 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2933/0066 (EP,US);
H01L33/0095 (EP,US);
H01L33/38 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/13] | H01L33/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Halbleiterlichtausgabevorrichtung und Halbleiterlichtausgabevorrichtung | [2011/13] | English: | Method for manufacturing semiconductor light-emitting device and semiconductor light emitting device | [2011/13] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un dispositif électroluminescent semi-conducteur et dispositif électroluminescent semi-conducteur | [2011/13] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2010 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 30.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/07] | 29.09.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE102007043877 (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE]) [X] 12,17-19 * paragraphs [0069] - [0112] - [0127] - [0135]; figures 1A-1H,4 * [Y] 3-5,13-15,20 [I] 1,2,6-11,16; | [YA]WO2008038249 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 3-5,13-15,20 * pages 6-7; figures 3-5 * [A] 1,2,6-12,16-19; | [A]EP1577958 (LUMILEDS LIGHTING LLC [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0018]; figures 13, 14A, 14B * | by applicant | US7256483 |