EP2204806 - Multi-layered information recording medium, reproduction apparatus, recording apparatus, reproduction method, and recording method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueda, Hiroshi Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Ito, Motoshi Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Ishida, Takashi Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Yamamoto, Yoshikazu Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
Shoji, Mamoru Panasonic Corporation IPROC IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2010/27] | Representative(s) | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 10154902.0 | 17.01.2003 | [2010/27] | Priority number, date | JP20020013491 | 22.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002013491 | JP20020056635 | 01.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002056635 | [2010/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2204806 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/18, G11B27/32 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
G11B20/1883 (EP,US);
G11B7/007 (KR);
G11B20/12 (KR);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B7/004 (KR);
G11B7/24038 (KR);
G11B2020/1826 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1893 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
G11B2220/235 (EP,US);
G11B2220/237 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SK [2010/27] | Title | German: | Mehrschichtiges Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium, Wiedergabegerät, Aufzeichnungsgerät, Wiedergabeverfahren und Aufzeichnungsverfahren | [2010/27] | English: | Multi-layered information recording medium, reproduction apparatus, recording apparatus, reproduction method, and recording method | [2010/27] | French: | Support d'enregistrement d'informations multicouche, appareil de reproduction, appareil d'enregistrement, procédé de reproduction, procédé d'enregistrement | [2010/27] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 04.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/18] | 04.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/18] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03000696.9 / EP1329888 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030000696) is 26.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1056089 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-5 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 16, paragraph 68 - column 21, paragraph 103 *; | [A]EP1152414 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5404357 (ITO MOTOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 11; figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO0007186 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-5 * page 1, line 9 - page 8, line 20; figures 1-6 * |