EP2290893 - Frequency Synchronization in OFDM Receiver using sliding Fourier Transform [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2011/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahmad, Jamil c/o NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | Krott, Michel NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | Krott, Michel NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 10154937.6 | 26.02.2010 | [2011/09] | Priority number, date | EP20090168483 | 24.08.2009 Original published format: EP 09168483 | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2290893 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
H04L27/2675 (EP,US);
H04L27/266 (EP,US);
H04L27/2684 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Frequenzsynchronisierung in einem OFDM Empfänger durch sliding Fourier Transform | [2011/09] | English: | Frequency Synchronization in OFDM Receiver using sliding Fourier Transform | [2011/09] | French: | Synchronisation de fréquence dans un recepteur OFDM par utilisation d'une transformée de Fourrier glissante | [2011/09] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/09] | 11.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9216063 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [I] 1-15 * figure 4 * * page 9, line 16 - page 15, line 11 * * figure 1 * * page 5, line 11 - line 28 * * figure 2 * * page 5, line 29 - page 6, line 4 * * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 15 *; | [I]US5692016 (VANSELOW FRANK [DE]) [I] 1,4-7,13,15 * figure 3 * * column 5 - column 6 *; | [A]WO0147204 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 6 * * figure 8 * * page 9, line 29 - page 10, line 19 * * page 11, line 21 - page 12, line 12 *; | [A]GB2261560 (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 5 * * page 7, line 21 - page 9, line 15 * * page 11, line 34 - page 12, line 1 *; | [A]WO03022004 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 15 * * page 6, line 16 - line 19 *; | [A]US5077531 (TAKEUCHI YOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1a * * figure 1b * * column 6, line 13 - line 15 * | [A] - JACOBSEN E ET AL, "The sliding DFT", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20030301), vol. 20, no. 2, ISSN 1053-5888, pages 74 - 80, XP011095794 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - SPRINGER T, "SLIDING FFT COMPUTES FREQUENCY SPECTRA IN REAL TIME", EDN ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWS, REED BUSINESS INFORMATION, HIGHLANDS RANCH, CO, US, (19880929), vol. 33, no. 20, ISSN 0012-7515, pages 161 - 166,168,1, XP000111000 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | - M. SPETH ET AL., "Optimum Receiver Design for Wireless BroadBand Systems Using OFDM - Part I/II", IEEE TRANS. COM., (1999), vol. COM-47, no. 11, pages 1668 - 1677 | - IEEE TRANS. COM., (2001), vol. COM-49, no. 4, pages 571 - 578 | - U. MENGALI ET AL., Synchronization Techniques for Digital Receivers, PLENUM PRESS, (1997), pages 391 - 395 | - L. ERUP ET AL., "Interpolation in Digital Modems-Part II: Implementation and Performance", IEEE TRANSACTION ON COMMUNICATIONS, (1993), vol. COM-41, no. 6, pages 998 - 1008 |